Mayhew v. Arizona, State of et al
Plaintiff: Alvin Mayhew
Defendant: Arizona, State of, Andrew Brown, Jamie Jenkins, Caryn Wagnor, Unknown Brown, Unknown Hart, Unknown Wagnor, Andrew Hart, Unknown Jenkins, Lyn Hart, Unknown Wagner and Caryn Wagner
Case Number: 2:2019cv00297
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Referring Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/7/19. (EJA)
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Stipulated) with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs by Alvin Mayhew. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Knowlton, Keith)
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) (JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT) filed by Defendants Arizona, State of, Lyn Hart, Jamie Jenkins, Caryn Wagner. (Bowen, James)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants Arizona, State of, Lyn Hart, Jamie Jenkins, Caryn Wagner. (Bowen, James)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Defendants, Jenkins, Wagner, Hart, and the State of Arizona have moved to amend and correct the caption in this matter to correct to the proper names and spellings of the Defendants' names #8 . Accordingly, it is ORDERED amending the caption to read as follows: Alvin Mayhew, an individual, Plaintiff, v. State of Arizona; Jamie Jenkins and Spouse Jenkins, husband and wife; Caryn Wagner and Spouse Wagner, husband and wife; Lyn Hart and Spouse Hart, husband and wife. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/08/2019. (REK)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: On the Court's own Motion, Scheduling Conference is re-set from 3/5/2019 to 3/8/2019 at 11:00 AM before Senior Judge Susan R Bolton. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption by Arizona, State of, Andrew Hart, Jamie Jenkins, Caryn Wagnor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bowen, James)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Arizona, State of, Andrew Hart, Jamie Jenkins, Caryn Wagnor. (Bowen, James)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Arizona, State of, Andrew Hart, Jamie Jenkins, Caryn Wagnor.(Bowen, James)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Case Management Conference is set for March 5, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 502, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/22/19. (MAW)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that this case be reassigned, by random lot, to another Judge in the District of Arizona. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-19-00297-PHX-SRB. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 1/18/2019. (REK)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16426092. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-0297-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
January 17, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Waiver of Service to Jamie Jenkins (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 8/3/2018); Declaration of Service of Summons, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration and Complaint upon Caryn Wagner, Andrew Brown, Office of the Attorney General State of Arizona on 4/20/2018 (originals filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 12/24/2018); and Acceptance of and Waiver of Service upon Lyn Hart and Spouse Hart on 1/7/2019 (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/17/2019). (MFR) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2018-090209. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16426092 filed by Jamie Jenkins, Andrew Hart, Arizona, State of, Caryn Wagnor. (Bowen, James) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, Part 1, #4 Exhibit A, Part 2)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayhew v. Arizona, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Represented By: James B Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Jenkins
Represented By: James B Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caryn Wagnor
Represented By: James B Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Wagnor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Hart
Represented By: James B Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyn Hart
Represented By: James B Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caryn Wagner
Represented By: James B Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Mayhew
Represented By: Keith M Knowlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?