Alter v. Intel Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Kerry Alter
Defendant: Vengroff Williams Incorporated, Unknown Parties, Intel Corporation and Reed Group
Case Number: 2:2019cv00304
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan M Brnovich: Telephone Conference held on 3/8/2019.ORDERED granting w/o objection #18 Motion for 30 day delay. Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss is due 4/8/2019. Plaintiff's failure to respond may be deemed by the Court as a consent to the motion and the Court will issue a ruling. The joint Rule 26(f) report shall be due on 4/8/2019. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is reset for 4/12/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. (Court Reporter Christine Coaly.) Hearing held 10:02 AM to 10:09 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA)
March 4, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION By Plaintiff to Request 30 Day Delay in Proceedings for Plaintiff to Retain an Adequate Attorney by Kerry Alter. (SST) (1 page)
March 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE re: NOTICE REGARDING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT ROPORT by Intel Corporation, Reed Group, Vengroff Williams Incorporated re: #7 Order, Set/Reset Hearings . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' completed parts of Joint Case Management Report)(Pridgen, Nancy)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 3/4/2019 re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 2/19/2019. (TCA)
February 15, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Kerry Alter. (LAD) (1 page)
January 29, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Reed Group. (Pridgen, Nancy)
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vengroff Williams Incorporated. (Pridgen, Nancy)
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Intel Corporation, Reed Group, Vengroff Williams Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Intel Corp. Short Term Disability Plan, #2 Exhibit 2 - Intel Corp. Long Term Disability Plan, #3 Exhibit 3 - Reimbursement Agreements)(Pridgen, Nancy)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #8 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel filed by Intel Corporation. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Nancy B Pridgen. (Pridgen, Nancy)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Intel Corporation. (Pridgen, Nancy)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy B Pridgen on behalf of Intel Corporation. (Pridgen, Nancy)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 3/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 1/22/2019. (TCA)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 1/22/2019. (TCA)
January 22, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Nancy B Pridgen on behalf of defendant Intel Corporation This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAR)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Intel Corporation. (BAR)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAR)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16427753. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 19-00304-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAR)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2018-015243. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16427753 filed by Intel Corporation. (Ryden, Monica) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alter v. Intel Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vengroff Williams Incorporated
Represented By: Nancy B Pridgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Monica Marie Ryden
Represented By: Nancy B Pridgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Group
Represented By: Nancy B Pridgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Alter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?