Reish et al v. Mukai
Appellee: Louie Mukai
Appellant: Robert Reish, Kathleen Reish and Ryuko Incorporated
Debtor: Phoenix Heliparts Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv00400
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 12 *MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Time to File Opening Brief to March 28, 2019 by Kathleen Reish, Robert Reish, Ryuko Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed order)(Horner, H) *Modified to remove ex-parte designation on 3/25/2019 (EJA).
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. The deadline for Appellants to file their Opening Brief is extended from 2/27/2019 through and including 3/19/2019. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/28/2019. (MMO)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief -Unopposed filed by Robert Reish, Kathleen Reish, Ryuko Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv LRCiv 7.1(a)(1). No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LAD)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 * MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief -Unopposed by Kathleen Reish, Robert Reish, Ryuko Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed order)(Horner, H) * Modified to remove ex parte designation; attorney noticed regarding Local Rule violation as to caption on 2/28/2019 (LAD).
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: The appellant shall serve and file an opening brief with the Clerk, United States District Court, within fourteen (14) days of the date this order is filed. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/11/2019. (MMO)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF READINESS. The Record on Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court is complete. The Bankruptcy Court shall retain the record. The filing of this Certificate constitutes the date of entry of the appeal on the docket in the District Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kathleen Reish, Robert Reish, Ryuko Incorporated. (Horner, H)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Phoenix Heliparts Incorporated, Louie Mukai. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA)
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Louie Mukai, Phoenix Heliparts Incorporated. (Cross, James)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Phoenix Heliparts Incorporated, Ryuko Incorporated. (EJA)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (EJA)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court by Kathleen Reish, Robert Reish, Ryuko Incorporated. (EJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reish et al v. Mukai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Louie Mukai
Represented By: James E Cross
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Finch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Robert Reish
Represented By: H Lee Horner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kathleen Reish
Represented By: H Lee Horner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ryuko Incorporated
Represented By: H Lee Horner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Phoenix Heliparts Incorporated
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Finch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?