Chavira v. Escobar et al
Plaintiff: Belem Chavira
Defendant: Unknown Escobar, Noel Escobar, Unknown Parties and Graybar Electric Company Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv00718
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/14/2020. Dispositive motions due by 3/13/2020. (See attached Order for additional deadlines and details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/1/19. (JAMA)
April 1, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John J Tuchi: Scheduling Conference held on 4/1/2019. Deadlines discussed and entered. Scheduling Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Kent Hammond for Plaintiff. Courtney Moran for Defendants. (Court Reporter Elaine Cropper.) Hearing held 2:00 PM to 2:18 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAMA)
March 20, 2019 Filing 15 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Belem Chavira. (Hammond, Kent)
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Belem Chavira. (Hammond, Kent)
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Graybar Electric Company Incorporated. (Moran, Courtney)
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Belem Chavira. (Hammond, Kent)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Order by Belem Chavira . (Hammond, Kent)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/1/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. The parties shall submit their joint proposed case management plan not less than seven (7) days before the Scheduling Conference. (See attached Order for additional details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/7/19. (JAMA)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/7/19. (JAMA)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 *DEFENDANTS' DEMAND for Jury Trial by Noel Escobar, Graybar Electric Company Incorporated. (Moran, Courtney) *Modified on 2/5/2019 to correct filing party docket text (MSA).
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 DEFENDANTS NOEL ESCOBAR AND GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Noel Escobar, Graybar Electric Company Incorporated.(Moran, Courtney)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Graybar Electric Company Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Graybar Electric Company, Inc. for Graybar Electric Company Incorporated. (Moran, Courtney)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Graybar Electric Company Incorporated. (KEP)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Noel Escobar, Graybar Electric Company Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16489800. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J. Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-718-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2018-014369. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16489800 filed by Graybar Electric Company Incorporated, Noel Escobar. (Moran, Courtney) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(KEP)
February 4, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration and Demand for Jury Trial upon Graybar Electric Company Inc., on 1/3/2019 and upon Noel Escobar and Jane Doe Escobar on 1/14/2019. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on January 7, 2019 and January 29, 2019) (KEP) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavira v. Escobar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Escobar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noel Escobar
Represented By: Courtney Denise Moran
Represented By: Jeremy C Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graybar Electric Company Incorporated
Represented By: Courtney Denise Moran
Represented By: Jeremy C Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belem Chavira
Represented By: Kent Jeffrey Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?