Howarth v. Patterson et al
Plaintiff: Morgan Howarth
Defendant: Ryan Patterson and Patterson Homes LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00726
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Bridget S Bade
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants Ryan Patterson, Patterson Homes LLC. (Brown, Nathanael)
April 1, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Morgan Howarth. (McKinney, Robert)
April 1, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Ryan Patterson, Patterson Homes LLC. (Brown, Nathanael)
April 1, 2019 Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER: This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV-19-726-PHX-ESW. Any deadlines and/or hearings are AFFIRMED unless reset by separate order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF)
March 29, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Nathanael Melvin Brown. (Brown, Nathanael)
March 29, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re: #28 MOTION to Strike #14 Answer to Complaint Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses First, Second, Third, Sixth, Eighth, Ninth, and Tenth filed by Ryan Patterson, Patterson Homes LLC. (Brown, Nathanael)
March 18, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Strike #14 Answer to Complaint Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses by Morgan Howarth. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKinney, Robert)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion Appear Telephonically. Plaintiff's counsel is granted permission to appear telephonically at the Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 3/12/19. (DXD)
March 12, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Appar Telephonically re: #25 Order, Set/Reset Hearings by Morgan Howarth. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKinney, Robert)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 304, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 3/11/19. (DXD)
March 11, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Patterson Homes LLC. (Brown, Nathanael)
March 11, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Patterson Homes LLC. (ESL)
March 7, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Rylan Stewart appearing for Ryan Patterson, Patterson Homes LLC. . (Stewart, Rylan)
March 7, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for April 4, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 6, 2019 Filing 20 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order that Ryan Patterson, Patterson Homes LLC show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/1/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
March 5, 2019 Filing 17 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 4, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #14 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document. If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within 7 days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within 7 days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. (DXD)
March 1, 2019 Filing 14 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ryan Patterson, Patterson Homes LLC.(Brown, Nathanael)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order that Morgan Howarth show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 3/18/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 Magistrate Election Form Deadline set as to Ryan Patterson, Patterson Homes. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #10 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel filed by Patterson Homes LLC, Ryan Patterson. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathanael Melvin Brown on behalf of Ryan Patterson, Patterson Homes LLC. (Brown, Nathanael)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Stipulation: Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 3/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 2/13/19. (DXD)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND RESPONSE DATE by Morgan Howarth. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKinney, Robert)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Morgan Howarth. (McKinney, Robert)
February 5, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Robert M McKinney on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ryan Patterson, Patterson Homes LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MFR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (MFR)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16491710. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bridget S Bade. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-0726-PHX-BSB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MFR)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Morgan Howarth. (McKinney, Robert) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MFR)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16491710 filed by Morgan Howarth. (McKinney, Robert) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howarth v. Patterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Patterson
Represented By: Rylan Jack Stewart
Represented By: Nathanael Melvin Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patterson Homes LLC
Represented By: Rylan Jack Stewart
Represented By: Nathanael Melvin Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Howarth
Represented By: Robert Buckner McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?