Aguilar v. T-Bird Southwest Restaurant Group LLC et al

Plaintiff: Shavonne Aguilar
Defendant: Outback Steakhouse of Florida LLC, Bloomin' Brands Incorporated, Unknown Parties, T-Bird Southwest Restaurant Group LLC, Cerca Trova Restaurant Concepts Incorporated and Cerca Trova Southwest Restaurant Group LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00728
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Remand (Doc. #6 ) and the Parties' Stipulation to Waive Attorneys' Fees re: Motion to Remand (Doc. #7 ). This matter is remanded to Maricopa County Superior Court, with each side to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk to close this matter. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/14/19. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter)(EJA)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION re: #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court to Waive Attorneys' Fees by Outback Steakhouse of Florida LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order re Remand to MCSC)(Baltierra, Matthew)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Shavonne Aguilar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand)(Call, Spenser)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC show cause in writing within seven days of the date of this Order why this case should not be remanded. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Defendant Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC fails to show cause in writing within seven days of the date of this Order, this case will be remanded without further notice. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/7/19. (JAMA) Modified on 2/7/2019 to add WO (JAMA).
February 5, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate, Demand for Jury Trial, Cover Sheet served upon Cerca Trova Restaurant Concepts and Cerca Trova Southwest Restaurant Group LLC, on 1/17/2019; Outback Steakhouse of Florida LLC and T-Bird Southwest Restaurant Group LLC on 1/16/2019. (Originals filed in the Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/18/2019). (BAR) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAR)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16491825. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 19-00728-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAR)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Outback Steakhouse of Florida LLC. (Baltierra, Matthew) (BAR)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2018-097366. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16491825 filed by Outback Steakhouse of Florida LLC. (Baltierra, Matthew) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibits A-B)(BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguilar v. T-Bird Southwest Restaurant Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outback Steakhouse of Florida LLC
Represented By: Matthew Bruce Baltierra
Represented By: Sean Patrick Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomin' Brands Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Bird Southwest Restaurant Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerca Trova Restaurant Concepts Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerca Trova Southwest Restaurant Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shavonne Aguilar
Represented By: Spenser Whitney Call
Represented By: Chad Alan Schaub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?