Collins et al v. Fraley et al
Plaintiff: Shiann Collins and John Collins
Defendant: Raymond Michael Fraley and Lori Elizabeth Fraley
Case Number: 2:2019cv00877
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John J Tuchi: Motion Hearing held on 3/27/2019. Discussion held. For the reasons as stated on the record, IT IS ORDER granting #1 Motion to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting #5 Application for Substitution of Counsel for Plaintiffs John and Shiann Collins. Retained attorneys Randy Nussbaum and Michael Galen shall be substituted in place of Joel Eric Sannes. Attorney Joel Eric Sannes terminated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot #8 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot #10 Defendants' Motion to Extend Discovery. APPEARANCES: Randy Nussbaum and Michael Galen for Plaintiffs. Pro Se Defendants Raymond Fraley and Lori Fraley. (Court Reporter Elaine Cropper.) Hearing held 10:03 AM to 10:48 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAMA)
March 19, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by John Collins, Shiann Collins. (Nussbaum, Randy)
March 19, 2019 Filing 15 *REPLY to Response to #5 Motion to Substitute Attorney, RESPONSE to #8 Motion for Protective Order by Plaintiffs John Collins, Shiann Collins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Nussbaum, Randy) *Modified to correct event and document link on 3/20/2019 (REK).
March 15, 2019 Filing 14 *REPLY to Response to Motion re: #1 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court by John Collins, Shiann Collins Reply in Support of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference by Plaintiffs John Collins, Shiann Collins. (Nussbaum, Randy) *Modified to correct event on 3/18/2019 (REK).
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #11 Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney) filed by John Collins, Shiann Collins. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Plaintiff's shall file a Reply to Defendant's Response #9 no later than March 22, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting a motion hearing on the Motion for Substitution of Counsel for Plaintiffs John and Shiann Collins #5 on March 27, 2019, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 W. Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J. Tuchi. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 3/15/2019. (REK)
March 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Randy Nussbaum. (Nussbaum, Randy)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Extend Discovery by Lori Elizabeth Fraley, Raymond Michael Fraley. (LAD) (3 pages)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition to #1 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court by John Collins, Shiann Collins filed by Lori Elizabeth Fraley, Raymond Michael Fraley. (LAD) (5 pages)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Protective Order by Lori Elizabeth Fraley, Raymond Michael Fraley. (LAD) (13 pages, same PDF as #7 )
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Lori Elizabeth Fraley, Raymond Michael Fraley. (LAD) (13 pages)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #5 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by John Collins, Shiann Collins. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by John Collins, Shiann Collins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nussbaum, Randy)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Defendants shall file with the Clerk of the Court and serve on opposing counsel a responsive memorandum to Plaintiff's Motion for Withdrawal of Reference #1 no later than March 11, 2019. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/19/2019. (REK)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (REK)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Matter. (REK)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court by John Collins, Shiann Collins. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins et al v. Fraley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Michael Fraley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Elizabeth Fraley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shiann Collins
Represented By: Joel Eric Sannes
Represented By: Randy Nussbaum
Represented By: Michael Galen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Collins
Represented By: Joel Eric Sannes
Represented By: Randy Nussbaum
Represented By: Michael Galen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?