Bruno v. Sherman & Howard LLC et al
Appellant: Paul Leonard Bruno
Appellee: Steve Brown, Thomas Bourke and Sherman & Howard LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01013
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed February 28, 2019, Appellants appeal is dismissed and this action is terminated. (MSA)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER dismissing this appeal and denying as moot any pending motions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/26/19. (MSA)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that, within ten days of the date of entry of this Order and as he was previously ordered to do by the BAP (Doc. #1 at 25-26), Appellant Paul Leonard Bruno shall provide the Court with verification that he paid the U.S. Bankruptcy Court the filing and docketing fees for this appeal, or otherwise file with this Court an adequate legal explanation as to why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to pay the filing and docketing fees. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this appeal. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/15/2019. (REK)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (REK)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Sherman & Howard LLC. (REK)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (REK)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Appellate Panel for the Ninth Circuit by Sherman & Howard LLC. (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruno v. Sherman & Howard LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Paul Leonard Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Steve Brown
Represented By: Steven Joseph Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Thomas Bourke
Represented By: Thomas K Bourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sherman & Howard LLC
Represented By: Craig Alan Morgan
Represented By: Bryan A Albue
Represented By: David A Weatherwax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?