Verde Investments Incorporated v. Browndorf et al
Plaintiff: Verde Investments Incorporated
Defendant: Matthew C Browndorf, DCM-P1 LLC, Plutos Sama LLC and Sarina Browndorf
Case Number: 2:2019cv01055
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Errata re: #11 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy of Defendant Plutos Sama, LLC by Plaintiff Verde Investments Incorporated.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sklar, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Plutos Sama, LLC by Verde Investments Incorporated. (Sklar, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED ORDER: Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the timerequired by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on May 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 2/15/2019. (TCA)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 **AMENDED BY DOC. 10* ORDER : Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the timerequired by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on April 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 2/15/2019. (TCA) Modified on 2/19/2019 (TCA).
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 2/15/2019. (TCA)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Matthew C Browndorf, Sarina Browndorf, DCM-P1 LLC, Plutos Sama LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Verde Investments Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16541160. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M. Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1055-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Verde Investments Incorporated. (Sklar, Jeffrey) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(KEP)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Verde Investments Incorporated. (Sklar, Jeffrey) (KEP)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16541160 filed by Verde Investments Incorporated. (Sklar, Jeffrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - B, #3 Exhibit C - F)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verde Investments Incorporated v. Browndorf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew C Browndorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCM-P1 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plutos Sama LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarina Browndorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verde Investments Incorporated
Represented By: Jeffrey Louis Sklar
Represented By: Susan M Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?