McRoberts v. SCP 2006-C23-210 LLC et al

Plaintiff: Carol McRoberts
Defendant: German Dobson CVS LLC, SCP 2006-C23-210 LLC, Unknown Parties and CVS Pharmacy Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv01159
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine
Referring Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/1/2019. Dispositive motions due by 3/1/2020. Telephonic Pre-motion Conference set for 11/7/2019 at 01:45 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/16/2019. (MMO)
April 16, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 4/16/2019. Deadlines discussed. Order to issue. APPEARANCES: Stephen Martin for Plaintiff. Nishan Wilde for Defendants. (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) Hearing held 1:30 PM to 1:51 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
April 15, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2019 at 4:30 PM is RESET IN TIME ONLY. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
April 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE re: Notice of no Objection to Joint Discovery Plan Document #16 by Carol McRoberts . (Martin, Stephen)
April 9, 2019 Filing 16 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Defendants CVS Pharmacy Incorporated, German Dobson CVS LLC, SCP 2006-C23-210 LLC. (Zelms, Robert)
April 5, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2019 at 9:00 AM is RESET IN TIME ONLY. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference reset for 4/16/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/26/19. (DXD)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - The parties are advised, pursuant to LRCiv 12.1(c), that motions to dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and motions for judgment on the pleadings under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(c) are discouraged if the defect(s) in the complaint can be cured by a permissible amendment. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file notice of service with the Court. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/26/19. (DXD)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Douglas L. Rayes. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-1159-PHX-DLR. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set before Judge Debora M. Fine on 4/11/19 at 9:30 AM is now RESET before Judge Douglas L. Rayes, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying CVS Pharmacy Incorporated as Corporate Parent to German Dobson CVS LLC by CVS Pharmacy Incorporated, German Dobson CVS LLC, SCP 2006-C23-210 LLC. (Wilde, Nishan) *Modified record on 2/25/2019 (DXD).
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2019 at 9:30 AM in Special Proceedings Courtroom, 2nd Floor, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 2/20/19. (DXD)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to CVS Pharmacy Incorporated, German Dobson CVS LLC, SCP 2006-C23-210 LLC. (MFR)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by CVS Pharmacy Incorporated, German Dobson CVS LLC, SCP 2006-C23-210 LLC. (Zelms, Robert) (MFR)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by CVS Pharmacy Incorporated, German Dobson CVS LLC, SCP 2006-C23-210 LLC. (Zelms, Robert) (MFR)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16555034. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1159-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (MFR)
February 20, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint and Certificate of Compulsory Abritration upon CVS Pharmacy Incorporated, German Dobson CVS LLC, and SCP 2006-C23-210 LLC on 1/23/2019 (originals filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/24/2019). (MFR) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-002385. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16555034 filed by CVS Pharmacy Incorporated, German Dobson CVS LLC, SCP 2006-C23-210 LLC. (Zelms, Robert) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McRoberts v. SCP 2006-C23-210 LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol McRoberts
Represented By: Stephen John Martin
Represented By: Kevin Michael Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: German Dobson CVS LLC
Represented By: Nishan Joseph Wilde
Represented By: Robert Bryan Zelms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCP 2006-C23-210 LLC
Represented By: Nishan Joseph Wilde
Represented By: Robert Bryan Zelms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Incorporated
Represented By: Nishan Joseph Wilde
Represented By: Robert Bryan Zelms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?