Finley v. Dick's Sporting Goods Health and Welfare Plan et al
Plaintiff: Ronald D Finley
Defendant: Dick's Sporting Goods Incorporated, Dick's Sporting Goods Health and Welfare Plan and Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 2:2019cv01215
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Bridget S Bade
Referring Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Case Management Conference is set for May 13, 2019, at 11:00 a.m., in Courtroom 601, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/1/19. (MAW)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Stipulation for Dismissal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. and Dick's Sporting Goods Health and Welfare Plan are dismissed without prejudice in this action and that Plaintiff shall bear his own costs and attorneys' fees with regard to such claims. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/1/19. (MAW)
April 1, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
April 1, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Rademaekers, Iwana)
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. and Dick's Sporting Goods Health and Welfare Plan Without Prejudice by Dick's Sporting Goods Health and Welfare Plan, Dick's Sporting Goods Incorporated, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rademaekers, Iwana)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the parties' stipulation (Doc. #12 ) and extending the deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's complaint to April 1, 2019. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 3/20/19. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRELIMINARY ORDER [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 3/18/19. (MAW)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Dick's Sporting Goods Health and Welfare Plan, Dick's Sporting Goods Incorporated, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rademaekers, Iwana)
March 18, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Iwana Rademaekers on behalf of defendants. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 14, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Dominic W. Lanza. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-1215-PHX-DWL. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for April 1, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order that Ronald D Finley show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/1/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ronald D Finley: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction, Civil Cover Sheet upon Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston on 2/26/2019. (Ronstadt, Erin)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ronald D Finley: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons, Complaint, Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction, Civil Cover Sheet upon Dick's Sporting Goods Health and Welfare Plan on 2/25/19. (Ronstadt, Erin)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ronald D Finley: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons, Complaint, Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction, Civil Cover Sheet upon Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. on 2/25/2019. (Ronstadt, Erin)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Dick's Sporting Goods Health and Welfare Plan, Dick's Sporting Goods Incorporated, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16565530. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bridget S Bade. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1215-PHX-BSB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Ronald D. Finley. (Ronstadt, Erin) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16565530 filed by Ronald D Finley. (Ronstadt, Erin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finley v. Dick's Sporting Goods Health and Welfare Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick's Sporting Goods Incorporated
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick's Sporting Goods Health and Welfare Plan
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald D Finley
Represented By: Erin Rose Ronstadt
Represented By: Clayton Warren Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?