Ellis et al v. Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District
Plaintiff: William Ellis, Robert Dill, Robert Gustavis and Edward Rupprecht
Defendant: Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District
Case Number: 2:2019cv01228
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for David Gringer on behalf of defendant. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 10, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Christopher E Babbitt on behalf of defendant. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The deadline for Defendant to respond to the complaint is extended to April 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 3/26/2019. (TCA)
March 22, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Alia M Abdi on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 21, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for David M Cialkowski on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading by Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to FIle Responsive Pleading)(Gere, Eric) *Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 3/22/2019 (SLQ).
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Dell Gere on behalf of Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District. (Gere, Eric)
March 15, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Daniel Nordin on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 14, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Daniel E Gustafson on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 13, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Daniel C Hedlund on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER : Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on May 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 2/26/2019. (TCA)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 2/26/2019. (TCA)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District. (BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16567079. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-01228-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Robert Dill, William Ellis, Robert Gustavis, Edward Rupprecht. (Robinovitch, Hart) (BAC)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-16567079 filed by Robert Gustavis, William Ellis, Edward Rupprecht, Robert Dill. (Robinovitch, Hart) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis et al v. Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ellis
Represented By: Hart Lawrence Robinovitch
Represented By: Daniel Gustafson
Represented By: Daniel C Hedlund
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Represented By: Alia M Abdi
Represented By: Daniel J Nordin
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Dill
Represented By: Hart Lawrence Robinovitch
Represented By: Daniel Gustafson
Represented By: Daniel C Hedlund
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Represented By: Alia M Abdi
Represented By: Daniel J Nordin
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gustavis
Represented By: Hart Lawrence Robinovitch
Represented By: Daniel Gustafson
Represented By: Daniel C Hedlund
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Represented By: Alia M Abdi
Represented By: Daniel J Nordin
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Rupprecht
Represented By: Hart Lawrence Robinovitch
Represented By: Daniel Gustafson
Represented By: Daniel C Hedlund
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Represented By: Alia M Abdi
Represented By: Daniel J Nordin
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District
Represented By: David Gringer
Represented By: Christopher E Babbitt
Represented By: Eric Dell Gere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?