Amerifresh Incorporated v. So Ono Food Products LLC et al
Plaintiff: Amerifresh Incorporated
Defendant: Richard C Wheeler, Fresh Foods Hawaii Incorporated, Uzor U Nwoko, So Ono Food Products LLC, MIBO Fresh Foods LLC and Paul A Janiak
Case Number: 2:2019cv01331
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants So Ono Food Products, LLC; Mibo Fresh Foods, LLC; Uzor U. Nwoko; and Paul A. Janiak by Amerifresh Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bart M. Botta in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Mike Kennedy in Support of Motion, #3 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Botta, Bart)
April 18, 2019 Filing 18 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Paul A Janiak, MIBO Fresh Foods LLC, Uzor U Nwoko, So Ono Food Products LLC - Pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and upon application by the Plaintiff, default is hereby entered against Defendant So Ono Food Products LLC, MIBO Fresh Foods LLC, Uzor U Nwoki and Paul A Janiak. (EJA)
April 16, 2019 Filing 17 *APPLICATION for Entry of Default as to Defendants So Ono Food Products, LLC; Mibo Fresh Foods, LLC; Uzor U. Nwoko; and Paul A. Janiak by Amerifresh Incorporated. (Botta, Bart) *Modified to correct event type on 4/18/2019 (EJA).
April 16, 2019 Filing 16 *NOTICE of Service filed by Amerifresh Incorporated: Certificate of Service re: Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference upon Defendants So Ono Food Products, LLC; Mibo Fresh Foods, LLC; Uzor U. Nwoko; and Paul A. Janiak on 04/16/2019. (Botta, Bart) *Modified to correct event type on 4/18/2019 (EJA).
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2019 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/11/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
March 12, 2019 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Amerifresh Incorporated: Declaration of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice of Availability of US Magistrate Judge, Notice to Parties Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, Order re Motion Practice upon Paul A Janiak on 03/07/2019. (Botta, Bart)
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Amerifresh Incorporated: Declaration of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice of Availability of US Magistrate Judge, Notice to Parties Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, Order re Motion Practice upon Uzor U Nwoko on 03/07/2019. (Botta, Bart)
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Amerifresh Incorporated: Declaration of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice of Availability of US Magistrate Judge, Notice to Parties Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, Order re Motion Practice upon Mibo Fresh Foods, LLC on 03/07/2019. (Botta, Bart)
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Amerifresh Incorporated: Declaration of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice of Availability of US Magistrate Judge, Notice to Parties Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, Order re Motion Practice upon So Ono Food Products, LLC on 03/07/2019. (Botta, Bart)
March 8, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Bart M Botta on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/28/2019. (LFIG)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Submitted by Amerifresh Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Mibo Fresh Foods LLC Summons, #2 Fresh Foods Hawaii Inc Summons, #3 Uzor U Nwoko Summons, #4 Paul A Janiak Summons, #5 Richard C Wheeler Summons)(Botta, Bart)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #2 Summons Submitted filed by Amerifresh Incorporated. One defendant should be listed per summons. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected documents. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAR)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Amerifresh Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAR)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAR)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16579820. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 19-01331-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAR)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amerifresh Incorporated. (Botta, Bart) (BAR)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Amerifresh Incorporated. (Botta, Bart) (BAR)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16579820 filed by Amerifresh Incorporated. (Botta, Bart) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amerifresh Incorporated v. So Ono Food Products LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard C Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresh Foods Hawaii Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uzor U Nwoko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: So Ono Food Products LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIBO Fresh Foods LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul A Janiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amerifresh Incorporated
Represented By: Bart M Botta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?