Sprout Financial LLC v. CapFund Enterprises Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Sprout Financial LLC
Defendant: CapFund Enterprises Incorporated, Jennifer Sciara and Brian Sciara
Case Number: 2:2019cv01349
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Remark: Pro Hac Vice Motion granted for Melissa Y. Lou on behalf of Plaintiff This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
April 1, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Bryce K Kumimoto and Robert Cassity on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 28, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CapFund Enterprises Incorporated. (Behm, Douglas)
March 28, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas F Behm on behalf of CapFund Enterprises Incorporated, Brian Sciara, Jennifer Sciara. (Behm, Douglas)
March 28, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Pat Lundvall on behalf of defendants. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 26, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE re: Settlement Negotiations by Sprout Financial LLC [NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS]. (Londen, Phillip)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER approving the #15 Stipulation and granting a one-time extension of time until 5/8/2019 for Defendants to respond to the complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/26/2019. (LFIG)
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Sprout Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Joseph)
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sprout Financial LLC: Notice of Service re: Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference [PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF THE COURT'S ORDER DATED MARCH 22, 2019 DOC 13] upon Attorneys for Defendants on 03/22/2019. (Londen, Phillip)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 5/23/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file notice of service. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/21/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sprout Financial LLC: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice to Parties- Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, Order regarding motions pursuant to FRCP 12(b) upon Jennifer Sciara on 3/6/2019. (Londen, Phillip)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sprout Financial LLC: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice to Parties- Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, Order regarding motions pursuant to FRCP 12(b) upon Brian Sciara on 3/6/2019. (Londen, Phillip)
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sprout Financial LLC: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice to Parties- Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, Order regarding motions pursuant to FRCP 12(b) upon CapFund Enterprises, Inc. on 3/4/2019. (Londen, Phillip)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants who have not yet appeared and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/28/2019. (LFIG)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Submitted by Sprout Financial LLC. (Roth, Joseph)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by Sprout Financial LLC. (Roth, Joseph)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Submitted by Sprout Financial LLC. (Roth, Joseph)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16580484. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1349-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sprout Financial LLC. (Roth, Joseph) (MCO)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16580484 filed by Sprout Financial LLC. (Roth, Joseph) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sprout Financial LLC v. CapFund Enterprises Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CapFund Enterprises Incorporated
Represented By: Pat Lundvall
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Sciara
Represented By: Pat Lundvall
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sciara
Represented By: Pat Lundvall
Represented By: Douglas F Behm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprout Financial LLC
Represented By: Robert J Cassity
Represented By: Melissa Y Lou
Represented By: Joseph Nathaniel Roth
Represented By: Phillip Winston Londen
Represented By: Bryce K Kunimoto
Represented By: Bryce Kunimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?