Broadcast Music Incorporated et al v. BLK, III LLC et al
Plaintiff: Reservoir Media Management Incorporated, Comart Music, Rondor Music International Incorporated, MJ Publishing Trust, Red Sea Songs, Embassy Music Corporation, Seether Publishing, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation, Broadcast Music Incorporated, Rick's Music Incorporated, Reservoir One America, EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated, E.O. Smith Music, Sushi Grade Music and Beechwood Music Corporation
Defendant: George Fischer, Kevin Johnson, Jeffrey Benice and BLK, III LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01358
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music Incorporated, Comart Music, E.O. Smith Music, EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated, Embassy Music Corporation, MJ Publishing Trust, Red Sea Songs, Reservoir Media Management Incorporated, Rick's Music Incorporated, Rondor Music International Incorporated, Seether Publishing, Sushi Grade Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation. (Deatherage, Mark)
April 2, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121 form)(BAC)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music Incorporated, Comart Music, E.O. Smith Music, EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated, Embassy Music Corporation, MJ Publishing Trust, Red Sea Songs, Reservoir Media Management Incorporated, Rick's Music Incorporated, Rondor Music International Incorporated, Seether Publishing, Sushi Grade Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Preliminary Order, Mandatory Initial Discovery User's Manual, Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project upon Business Filings Incorporated on 03/14/2019. (Deatherage, Mark)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on May 29, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; 3. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall file with the Clerk of Court a notice of service of MIDP Responses, supplemental MIDP Responses, and production of ESI, rather than copies of the actual disclosures [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 3/12/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice - MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music Incorporated, Comart Music, E.O. Smith Music, EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated, Embassy Music Corporation, MJ Publishing Trust, Red Sea Songs, Reservoir Media Management Incorporated, Rick's Music Incorporated, Rondor Music International Incorporated, Seether Publishing, Sushi Grade Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery upon Business Filings Incorporated on 03/07/19. (Deatherage, Mark)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to BLK, III LLC, Jeffrey Benice, George Fischer, Kevin Johnson. (BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16584420. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-01358-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music Incorporated, Comart Music, E.O. Smith Music, EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated, Embassy Music Corporation, MJ Publishing Trust, Red Sea Songs, Reservoir Media Management Incorporated, Rick's Music Incorporated, Rondor Music International Incorporated, Seether Publishing, Sushi Grade Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation. (BAC)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music Incorporated, Comart Music, E.O. Smith Music, EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated, Embassy Music Corporation, MJ Publishing Trust, Red Sea Songs, Reservoir Media Management Incorporated, Rick's Music Incorporated, Rondor Music International Incorporated, Seether Publishing, Sushi Grade Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation. (BAC)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-16584420 filed by Seether Publishing, EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated, MJ Publishing Trust, Broadcast Music Incorporated, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation, Comart Music, Rick's Music Incorporated, E.O. Smith Music, Reservoir Media Management Incorporated, Sushi Grade Music, Beechwood Music Corporation, Red Sea Songs, Embassy Music Corporation, Rondor Music International Incorporated. (Deatherage, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music Incorporated et al v. BLK, III LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reservoir Media Management Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comart Music
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MJ Publishing Trust
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Sea Songs
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Embassy Music Corporation
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seether Publishing
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick's Music Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reservoir One America
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.O. Smith Music
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sushi Grade Music
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beechwood Music Corporation
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Benice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLK, III LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?