Union Pacific Railroad Company v. Sisson Farms Limited et al
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Defendant: Unknown Perry, Ellen Hettinga, Sisson Farms Limited, Cody Perry and Hein Hettinga
Case Number: 2:2019cv01439
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Filing 14 Union Pacific's ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendants by Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Keeler, Karen)
April 18, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Karen M Keeler on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER the parties must file an updated status report or notice of settlement with the Court no later than June 30, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference scheduled for June 25, 2019 is hereby vacated, to be reset, if necessary, by separate order. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/11/2019. (LFIG)
April 9, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Settlement Talks/Discussions by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Hancock, Anthony)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 6/25/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/3/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ellen Hettinga, Hein Hettinga, Cody Perry. (Jacobson, Jay)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Ellen Hettinga, Hein Hettinga, Cody Perry. (Jacobson, Jay)
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cody Perry, Hein Hettinga, and Ellen Hettinga and, First COUNTERCLAIM by Hein Hettinga and Ellen Hettinga against Union Pacific Railroad Company by Ellen Hettinga, Cody Perry, Hein Hettinga.(Jacobson, Jay)
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Pacific Railroad Company identifying Corporate Parent Union Pacific Corporation for Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Hancock, Anthony)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/1/2019. (LFIG)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16597360. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1439-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Hancock, Anthony) (MFR)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16597360 filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Hancock, Anthony) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union Pacific Railroad Company v. Sisson Farms Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Hettinga
Represented By: Jay Christopher Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sisson Farms Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Perry
Represented By: Jay Christopher Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hein Hettinga
Represented By: Jay Christopher Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Anthony J Hancock
Represented By: Shimin Luo
Represented By: Karen M Keeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?