Aziz v. Ramirez et al
Plaintiff: Mahamed A Aziz
Defendant: William Barr, Al Gallmann, Kirstjen Nielsen, Lee Cissna, John Ramirez and Elizabeth A Strange
Case Number: 2:2019cv01496
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine
Referring Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - Case reassigned to Judge Diane J Humetewa by random lot for all further proceedings. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-19-01496-PHX-DJH. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 3/21/19. (DXD)
March 21, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Al Gallmann. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 20, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Submitted by Mahamed A Aziz. (Vacek-Aranda, Alice)
March 20, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Submitted by Mahamed A Aziz. (Vacek-Aranda, Alice)
March 19, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge John J. Tuchi. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-1496-PHX-JJT. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #7 Summons Submitted filed by Mahamed A Aziz. Party name does not match complaint. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 19, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to William Barr, Lee Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, John Ramirez, Elizabeth A Strange. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 18, 2019 Filing 15 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Submitted by Mahamed A Aziz. (Vacek-Aranda, Alice)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Submitted by Mahamed A Aziz. (Vacek-Aranda, Alice)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Submitted by Mahamed A Aziz. (Vacek-Aranda, Alice)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Submitted by Mahamed A Aziz. (Vacek-Aranda, Alice)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Submitted by Mahamed A Aziz. (Vacek-Aranda, Alice)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by Mahamed A Aziz. (Vacek-Aranda, Alice)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #4 Summons Submitted filed by Mahamed A Aziz. Please submit summons with one defendant listed per summons. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected documents. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Mahamed A Aziz. (Vacek-Aranda, Alice)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAR)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16607284. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 19-01496-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (BAR)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW OF DENIAL OF APPLICATION FOR NATURALIZATION. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16607284 filed by Mahamed A Aziz. (Vacek-Aranda, Alice) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Index, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(BAR) Modified on 3/5/2019 (BAR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aziz v. Ramirez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Gallmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth A Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahamed A Aziz
Represented By: Alice Vacek-Aranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?