Cross v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al

Plaintiff: Steven Cross
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv01801
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript re: #7 Answer to Complaint filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Transcript)(Talbert, Daniel)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript re: #7 Answer to Complaint filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Transcript, #3 Administrative 2017, #4 Payment 2017, #5 Jurisdiction 2017, #6 Non-Disability 2017, #7 Disability 2017, #8 Med Rec 2017, #9 Administrative 2019, #10 Payment 2019, #11 Jurisdiction 2019, #12 Non-Disability 2019, #13 Disability 2019, #14 Med Rec 2019)(Talbert, Daniel)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Talbert, Daniel)
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 *NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Daniel Talbert appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Talbert, Daniel) *Modified on 4/1/2019 to remove plaintiff name as name of counsel (MSA).
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties must fully comply with the deadlinesand procedures. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 3/20/2019. (TCA)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16661523. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-01801-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Steven Cross. (Dicus, Kathryn) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-16661523 filed by Steven Cross. (Dicus, Kathryn) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cross v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Cross
Represented By: Kathryn Dicus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Daniel P Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?