Talbott v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Jennifer R Talbott
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv01812
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Transcript, #3 Administrative, #4 Payment, #5 Jurisdictional, #6 Non Disability, #7 Disability, #8 Med Recs 1, #9 Med Recs 2, #10 Med Recs 3, #11 Med Recs 4, #12 Med Recs 5, #13 Administrative, #14 Payment, #15 Jurisdictional, #16 Non Disability 1, #17 Non Disability 2, #18 Non Disability 3, #19 Disability, #20 Med Recs 1, #21 Med Recs 2, #22 Med Recs 3, #23 Med Recs 4, #24 Med Recs 5, #25 Med Recs 6)(Cheung, Allison)
June 7, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Cheung, Allison)
April 19, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 18, 2019 Filing 13 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Election Form Deadline set as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jennifer R Talbott: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Matthew G Whitaker, Acting US Attorney General (04/08/19); Nancy A. Berryhill, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (04/08/19); Elizabeth Strange, First Assistant US Attorney for the District of Arizona (04/08/19) on 04/08/19; 04/08/19; 04/08/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Domestic return receipts and certified mail receipts)(Caldwell, Mark)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Allison Cheung appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Cheung, Allison)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. See document for full deadlines and details. Plaintiff shall serve Defendant with a copy of this Order within fifteen (15) days of any appearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 3/27/2019. (RMV)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S. Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1812-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (KEP)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Jennifer R Talbott. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KEP)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jennifer R Talbott. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(KEP)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jennifer R Talbott. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talbott v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer R Talbott
Represented By: Mark Ross Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Allison Jaime Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?