Harris v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Plaintiff: Michelle Harris
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2019cv01857
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Referring Judge: Deborah M Fine
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (ERISA): Plaintiffs opening brief will be due on March 20, 2020. Defendants response will be due on April 17, 2020. Plaintiffs reply will be due on May 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/21/2019. (TCA)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan M Brnovich: Scheduling Conference held on 6/21/2019. Discussion held. Court will enter a case management order. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Clayton Richards and Erin Ronstadt for Plaintiff. Telephonic appearance by Kristina Holmstrom for Defendant (Court Reporter Linda Schroeder.) Hearing held 9:02 AM to 9:04 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Michelle Harris. (Ronstadt, Erin)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Scheduling Conference is set for 6/21/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 5/29/2019. (TCA)
May 15, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Holmstrom, Kristina)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 4/18/2019. (TCA)
April 17, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan M. Brnovich. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-1857-PHX-SMB. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for May 6, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order that Michelle Harris show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 5/6/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Election Form Deadline set as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting the parties' Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint #6 . Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America shall have through and including May 15, 2019 to respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 4/11/2019. (REK)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holmstrom, Kristina)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Michelle Harris: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction, Civil Cover Sheet upon Life Insurance Company of North America on 3/22/2019. (Ronstadt, Erin)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16681568. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M. Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1857-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (KEP)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Michelle Harris. (Ronstadt, Erin) (KEP)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16681568 filed by Michelle Harris. (Ronstadt, Erin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Kristina Novotny Holmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Harris
Represented By: Erin Rose Ronstadt
Represented By: Clayton Warren Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?