Muhammad-El v. Total Card Incorporated

Plaintiff: Thomas Muhammad-El
Defendant: Total Card Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv01903
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed July 2, 2019, Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice. (MSA)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - This action is dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/1/19. (MSA)
May 21, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Total Card Incorporated. (Narita, Tomio)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - The #14 Rule 26(f) Case Management Report is stricken and the Case Management Conference currently scheduled for May 14, 2019 is vacated. Plaintiff must show cause in writing why this action should not be dismissed for failure to comply with this Court's Order and prosecute this action no later than June 21, 2019. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 5/7/19. (MSA)
May 3, 2019 Filing 14 *STRICKEN BY #15 ORDER* Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) (Defendant's Report) filed by Defendant Total Card Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Case Management Order)(Narita, Tomio) Modified on 5/7/2019 (MSA).
April 29, 2019 Filing 13 *Notice of Service of Discovery filed by Defendant Total Card Incorporated. (Narita, Tomio) *Modified on 4/30/2019 to correct event type (MSA).
April 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Total Card Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certification Under Rule 12.1c, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Narita, Tomio)
April 1, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Tomio B Narita on behalf of defendant. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 3/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(LMR)
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Total Card Incorporated.(Narita, Tomio)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 3/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(LMR)
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Total Card Incorporated. (Watson, Daxton)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Total Card Incorporated. (Watson, Daxton)
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Total Card Incorporated. (MFR)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Total Card Incorporated. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit a Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet when filing a notice of removal. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (MFR)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16687990. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1903-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-000489. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16687990 filed by Total Card Incorporated. (Watson, Daxton) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Docket)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhammad-El v. Total Card Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Card Incorporated
Represented By: Michael Herman Orcutt
Represented By: Daxton Reese Watson
Represented By: Tomio B Narita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Muhammad-El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?