Reichard et al v. Brown

Appellant: John Robert Reichard and Eircka Rae Reichard
Appellee: Russell Brown
Case Number: 2:2019cv02010
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY BRIEF by Eircka Rae Reichard, John Robert Reichard. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix II)(Allegrucci, David)
June 26, 2019 Filing 18 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #17 Brief - Bankruptcy Response Appellee's Supplemental Excerpts of Record by Appellee Russell Brown. (Flinn, Rachel)
June 26, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE BRIEF by Russell Brown. (Flinn, Rachel)
June 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #5 Brief - Bankruptcy Opening and #6 , #7 , #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 , #13 , #14 and #15 Additional Attachments to Main Document filed by John Robert Reichard, Eircka Rae Reichard. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA)
June 12, 2019 Filing 15 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #3 Certificate of Readiness, #5 Brief - Bankruptcy Opening Excerpt of Record 12 & 13 by Appellants Eircka Rae Reichard, John Robert Reichard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Case Docket, #2 Exhibit EOR 12 Continued, #3 Exhibit Notice of Appeal)(Allegrucci, David)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #3 Certificate of Readiness, #5 Brief - Bankruptcy Opening Excerpt of Record Numbers 10 & 11 by Appellants Eircka Rae Reichard, John Robert Reichard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Trustee Supplement, #2 Exhibit Final Memorandum)(Allegrucci, David)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #3 Certificate of Readiness, #5 Brief - Bankruptcy Opening Excerpt of Record 9 by Appellants Eircka Rae Reichard, John Robert Reichard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit EOR 9 Continued)(Allegrucci, David)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #3 Certificate of Readiness, #5 Brief - Bankruptcy Opening Excerpts of Record Number 8 by Appellants Eircka Rae Reichard, John Robert Reichard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Trustee Response, #2 Exhibit EOR 8 Continued)(Allegrucci, David)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #3 Certificate of Readiness, #5 Brief - Bankruptcy Opening Excerpt of Record Number 7 by Appellants Eircka Rae Reichard, John Robert Reichard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Chapter 13 Plan)(Allegrucci, David)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #3 Certificate of Readiness, #5 Brief - Bankruptcy Opening Excerpts of Record Number 6 by Appellants Eircka Rae Reichard, John Robert Reichard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply Supporting Confirmation, #2 Exhibit EOR 6 Continued)(Allegrucci, David)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #3 Certificate of Readiness, #5 Brief - Bankruptcy Opening Excerpts of Record Number 5 by Appellants Eircka Rae Reichard, John Robert Reichard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decision on Appeal)(Allegrucci, David)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #3 Certificate of Readiness, #5 Brief - Bankruptcy Opening Excerpts of Record Number 4 by Appellants Eircka Rae Reichard, John Robert Reichard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Set Hearing, #2 Exhibit EOR 4 Continued)(Allegrucci, David)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #3 Certificate of Readiness, #5 Brief - Bankruptcy Opening Excerpts of Record Number 3 by Appellants Eircka Rae Reichard, John Robert Reichard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Trustee Recommendation)(Allegrucci, David)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #3 Certificate of Readiness, #5 Brief - Bankruptcy Opening Excerpts of Record 1-2 by Appellants Eircka Rae Reichard, John Robert Reichard. (Attachments: #1 Errata Chapter 13 Plan, #2 Exhibit Harley Claim)(Allegrucci, David)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 OPENING BRIEF by Eircka Rae Reichard, John Robert Reichard. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix, #2 Appendix Continued)(Allegrucci, David)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 BANKRUPTCY APPEAL SCHEDULING ORDER: PURSUANT to Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 8008 and 8009, and by this order, the appellant shall serve and file an opening brief with the Clerk, United States District Court, within fourteen (14) days after the date this order is filed. The appellee shall serve and file a responsive brief with the Clerk, United States District Court, within fourteen (14) days after service of the appellant's brief; and the appellant may serve and file a reply with the Clerk, United States District Court, within fourteen (14) days after service of the appellee's brief. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/28/19. (CLB)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF READINESS. The Record on Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court is complete. The Bankruptcy Court shall retain the record. The filing of this Certificate constitutes the date of entry of the appeal on the docket in the District Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (DXD)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reichard et al v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: John Robert Reichard
Represented By: David E Allegrucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Eircka Rae Reichard
Represented By: David E Allegrucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Russell Brown
Represented By: Russell Aaron Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?