Aten v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Barry Aten
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv02061
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #23 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Barry Aten. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1) - The name, address, email address, State Bar Attorney number, telephone number, and optionally the fax number, of the attorney appearing for teh party in the action or proceeding and whether the attorney appears for the plaintiff, defendant, or other party - in propria persona - must be typewritten or printed in the space to the left of the center of the page and beginning at line one (1) on the first page. The space to the right of the center must be reserved for the filing marks of the Clerk. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
July 11, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: 18 Order, Set Deadlines by Plaintiff Barry Aten. (Feden, Nicholas)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying the #20 Motion for Extension of Time. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have up to and through July 11, 2019 to show good cause why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 4(m). Failure to show good cause by that date will result in dismissal of this case without further notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/2/2019. (LFIG)
July 3, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #19 MOTION for Extension of Time To Serve Summons filed by Barry Aten, #20 MOTION for Extension of Time To Serve Summons filed by Barry Aten. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1) - The name, address, email address, State Bar Attorney number, telephone number, and optionally the fax number, of the attorney appearing for the party in the action or proceeding and whether the attorney appears for the plaintiff, defendant, or other party - in propria persona - must be typewritten or printed in the space to the left of the center of the page and beginning at line one (1) on the first page. The space to the right of the center must be reserved for the filing marks of the Clerk. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
July 3, 2019 Filing 20 *Amended MOTION for Extension of Time To Serve Summons by Barry Aten. (Feden, Nicholas) *Modified to reflect "amended" on 7/3/2019 (REK).
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time To Serve Summons by Barry Aten. (Feden, Nicholas)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Upon its own review, the Court notes that 90 days have passed since Plaintiff filed the #1 Complaint, and an Affidavit of Service has yet to be filed in accordance with Rule 4(l) and (m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that within 14 days of this Order, Plaintiff shall show good cause why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 4(m). Failure to show good cause by that date will result in dismissal of this case without further notice to Plaintiff. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/27/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
April 26, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney's Office. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 25, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Submitted by Barry Aten. (Feden, Nicholas)
April 23, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #13 Summons Submitted filed by Barry Aten. Unable to issue Summons submitted for Mark Brnovich - Arizona Attorney General - incorrect party. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please resubmit summons for US Attorney's Office in Phoenix. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 23, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS)
April 23, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Submitted by Barry Aten. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Feden, Nicholas)
April 22, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Submitted by Barry Aten. (Feden, Nicholas)
April 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #10 Summons Submitted filed by Barry Aten. Bottom of Summons must contain information for issuing attorney. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please resubmit completed form with attorney contact information at bottom. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Submitted by Barry Aten. (Feden, Nicholas)
April 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #8 MOTION for Issuance of Summons filed by Barry Aten. Summons submitted as motion. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile summons (correctly complete bottom of form including attorney informatoin) using Summons Submitted event. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 *SUMMONS Submitted by Barry Aten. (Feden, Nicholas) *Modified to correct event type on 4/19/2019 (EJA).
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/1/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE: ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendant(s) in this matter, without further notice or order from the Court, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on June 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/1/2019. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting the #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/1/2019. (LFIG)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Barry Aten. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please re-file the current, automated civil cover sheet to include the correct format. Summons was not submitted, as it is incomplete. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-02061-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Barry Aten. (Feden, Nicholas) (BAC)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Barry Aten. (Feden, Nicholas) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit-Summons)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aten v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Aten
Represented By: Nicholas D Feden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?