Fitts v. Octave
Plaintiff: Nicholas Fitts
Defendant: Dieuson Octave and Bill K Kapri
Case Number: 2:2019cv02208
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Dieuson Octave a/k/a Bill K. Kapri p/k/a Kodak Black by Nicholas Fitts. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Default Judgment)(Clarke, Alan)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Dieuson Octave. (GMP)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT by Nicholas Fitts. (Clarke, Alan)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Nicholas Fitts against Defendant Dieuson Octave a/k/a Bill K. Kapri p/k/a Kodak Black. (Clarke, Alan)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that counsel for Plaintiff shall file a status report within 7 days of the date of this Order concerning the status of its case against Defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall terminate this case without further order of the Court, if Plaintiff fails to file either a status report or an application for entry of default within the timeframe specified herein. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/10/19. (CLB)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Nicholas Fitts: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Availability of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Judgment, Notice to Parties of Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, General Order and Order upon Defendant Dieuson Octave a/k/a Bill K. Kapri p/k/a Kodak Black on 05/16/2019. (Clarke, Alan)
April 5, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Alan S Clarke on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/4/2019. (MMO)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Nicholas Fitts. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1) -(a)Title Page. The following information must be stated upon the first page of every document and may be presented for filing single-spaced:The name, address, email address, State Bar Attorney number, telephone number, and optionally the fax number, of the attorney appearing for the party in the action or proceeding and whether the attorney appears for the plaintiff, defendant, or other party - in propria persona - must be typewritten or printed in the space to the left of the center of the page and beginning at line one (1) on the first page. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Dieuson Octave. (DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
April 4, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16737676. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2208-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Nicholas Fitts. (Clarke, Alan) (DLC)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16737676 filed by Nicholas Fitts. (Clarke, Alan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitts v. Octave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dieuson Octave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill K Kapri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Fitts
Represented By: Alan S Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?