International Business Machines Corporation v. Expedia Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: International Business Machines Corporation
Defendant: Hotels.com LP, Expedia Incorporated, Hotwire Incorporated and Orbitz LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02296
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 19 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by International Business Machines Corporation: Affidavit of Service re: Summons upon Hotels.com on 7/01/19. (Dunkelman, Brett)
July 3, 2019 Filing 18 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by International Business Machines Corporation: Affidavit of Service re: Summons upon Orbitz, LLC on 7/01/19. (Dunkelman, Brett)
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by International Business Machines Corporation: Affidavit of Service re: summons, complaint, order, midp notice upon Hotwire Inc on 7/1/19. (Dunkelman, Brett) *Modified to correct event type on 7/3/2019 (EJA).
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by International Business Machines Corporation: Affidavit of Service re: summons, complaint, order, midp notice upon Expedia Inc on 7/1/19. (Dunkelman, Brett) *Modified to correct event type on 7/3/2019 (EJA).
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett L Dunkelman on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation. (Dunkelman, Brett)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Submitted by International Business Machines Corporation. (Fraser, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Submitted by International Business Machines Corporation. (Fraser, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Submitted by International Business Machines Corporation. (Fraser, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Submitted by International Business Machines Corporation. (Fraser, Eric)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal Wesley White filed by Eric Michael Fraser. (Fraser, Eric)
April 30, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Wesley White on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 16, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Karim Z Oussayef on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 16, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Robert C Harrits on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Fraser, Eric)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on July 8, 2019.. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 4/10/2019. (TCA)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 4/10/2019. (TCA)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (MFR)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16765316. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2296-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by International Business Machines Corporation. (Fraser, Eric) (MFR)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16765316 filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Fraser, Eric) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Business Machines Corporation v. Expedia Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotels.com LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expedia Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotwire Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orbitz LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Business Machines Corporation
Represented By: Eric Michael Fraser
Represented By: Robert C Harrits
Represented By: Karim Z Oussayef
Represented By: Brett L Dunkelman
Represented By: Wesley L White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?