Landseadel v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Robert Landseadel
Defendant: Unknown Parties and USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02316
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Referring Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Ronan, Kristyn)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/10/2020. Dispositive motions due by 8/17/2020 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 5/30/19. (MAW)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The Court, having reviewed the parties' joint Rule 26(f) report (Doc. #22 ), concludes it is unnecessary to hold a Rule 16 Case Management Conference. Accordingly, the hearing set on 6/5/2019 is vacated. The Court will separately issue the Case Management Order. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 5/30/19. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
May 29, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #22 Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP filed by Robert Landseadel. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by attorney Dennis O'Berry but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Richard Suzuki. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
May 28, 2019 Filing 22 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Landseadel. (Suzuki, Richard)
May 21, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #20 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery filed by Robert Landseadel. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LAD)
May 21, 2019 Filing 20 * NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Robert Landseadel. (Suzuki, Richard) * Document not in compliance with Local Rule; attorney noticed on 5/22/2019 (LAD).
May 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Ronan, Kristyn)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Case Management Conference is set for June 5, 2019, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 601, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 5/1/19. (MAW)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRELIMINARY ORDER [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 5/1/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice - MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW)
May 1, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE re: Amended Notice of Removal by USAA Casualty Insurance Company re: #15 Order, Set Deadlines . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E)(Ronan, Kristyn)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that removing Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company shall file an amended notice of removal properly stating a jurisdictional basis for this action no later than May 6, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Defendant fails to file an amended notice of removal by May 6, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall remand this action to state court on May 7, 2019 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/29/19. (MAW)
April 26, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Dominic W. Lanza. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-2316-PHX-DWL. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference is affirmed unless reset by separate order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 24, 2019 Filing 13 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Scheduling Conference set for 6/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 4/18/19. (MSA)
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE re: Notice of Service by USAA Casualty Insurance Company re: #6 Order of Recusal . (Ronan, Kristyn)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #8 Answer to Complaint filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document signed by attorney K. Michelle Ronan but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Nathan Meyer. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 *ANSWER to Complaint by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Meyer, Nathan) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation; attorney noticed on 4/18/2019 (SST).
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Election Form Deadline. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. That this matter has been reassigned by the Clerk of Court, by random lot, to the Honorable Michelle H. Burns, United States Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-19-02316-PHX-MHB. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/16/19. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/10/2019. (LFIG)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16768531. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2316-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USAA Casualty Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate United Services Automobile Association for USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Meyer, Nathan)(MCO)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-001306. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16768531 filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Meyer, Nathan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landseadel v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Nathan David Meyer
Represented By: Kristyn Michelle Ronan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Landseadel
Represented By: Dennis Charles O'Berry
Represented By: Richard J Suzuki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?