Kulliver v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Adam Kulliver
Defendant: Unknown Parties and USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02383
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Stay until 11/29/2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/25/2019. (TCA)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Litigation by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ronan, Kristyn)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Adam Kulliver. (Fucetola, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Ronan, Kristyn)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 12/6/2019. Dispositive motions due by 5/1/2020. Telephone Trial Conference set for 5/15/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. Scheduling conference set for 5/31/2019 is vacated. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 5/29/2019. (TCA)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 *Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) by Plaintiff Adam Kulliver. (Fucetola, James) *Modified to correct event type on 5/28/2019 (EJA).
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Ronan, Kristyn)
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #8 Notice (Other) filed by Adam Kulliver. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE re: Service of Court Order by Adam Kulliver . (Attachments: #1 Order)(Fucetola, James)
April 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Ronan, Kristyn)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference sis et for 5/31/2019 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 4/15/2019. (TCA)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 4/15/2019. (TCA)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KAH)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16781252. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-02383-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH)
April 12, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Affidavit of Service as to USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 3/18/19.) (KAH) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Meyer, Nathan) (KAH)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-005316. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16781252 filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Meyer, Nathan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kulliver v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Kulliver
Represented By: Brett Lawrence Slavicek
Represented By: James Ernest Fucetola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Nathan David Meyer
Represented By: Kristyn Michelle Ronan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?