Austin v. Desert Vein & Vascular Institute PC

Plaintiff: Michael Austin
Defendant: Desert Vein & Vascular Institute PC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02387
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Desert Vein & Vascular Institute PC. (Bycer, Matthew)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Desert Vein & Vascular Institute PC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bycer, Matthew)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Lawrence Bycer on behalf of Desert Vein & Vascular Institute PC. (Bycer, Matthew)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Michael Austin: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 04/30/2019 to Timothy W. Holt . (Murphy, Mariel)
June 5, 2019 Remark: as to out of state counsel Christopher Seidman - removed for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED pursuant to Rule 4(m), Fed. R. Civ. P., that this action shall be dismissed without further notice after July 11, 2019, unless before then Plaintiff has served Defendant with the summons and complaint and has filed with the Clerk of the Court proof thereof pursuant to Rule 4(l) or has shown good cause for the failure to timely serve. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/5/19. (MAW)
May 17, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Amanda Bruss and Mariel Murphy on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Desert Vein & Vascular Institute PC. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Michael Austin. (Bruss, Amanda) (MCO)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16781348. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2387-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Michael Austin. (Bruss, Amanda) (MCO)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16781348 filed by Michael Austin. (Bruss, Amanda) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin v. Desert Vein & Vascular Institute PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Vein & Vascular Institute PC
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Bycer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Austin
Represented By: Christopher Seidman
Represented By: Amanda L Bruss
Represented By: Mariel Diana Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?