McGee v. Wright Medical Technology Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Christine McGee
Defendant: Unknown Parties and Wright Medical Technology Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv02466
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Defendant's #12 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/8/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order)(Braddock, Cory)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/3/2020. Dispositive motions due by 8/19/2020. ORDERED vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2019. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/25/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Christine McGee. (Clark, Shannon)
May 30, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Dana J Ash on behalf of Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 29, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Nicholas M Centrella Jr. on behalf of defendant Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 28, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Sean K Burke on behalf of defendant. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Jones, Jacob)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Christine McGee. (Clark, Shannon)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 7/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/24/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wright Medical Technology Incorporated.(Jones, Jacob)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/17/19. (CLB)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16798285. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2466-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Jones, Jacob) (KEP)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-001616. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16798285 filed by Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Jones, Jacob) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Affidavit)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGee v. Wright Medical Technology Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Incorporated
Represented By: Cory L Braddock
Represented By: Jacob Christensen Jones
Represented By: Nicholas M Centrella, Jr.
Represented By: Dana J Ash
Represented By: Sean K Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine McGee
Represented By: Shannon L Clark
Represented By: Matthew Robert Boatman
Represented By: Robert W Boatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?