Broadcast Music Incorporated et al v. HGJB Enterprises LLC et al
Plaintiff: AF Circle C Fund LLC, Eleksylum Music Incorporated, Division of Praxis International Communications Incorporated, Coral Reefer Music, Welsh Witch Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation, Broadcast Music Incorporated, Fourteenth Hour Music Incorporated, Cotillion Music Incorporated, No Surrender Music and Broken Arrow Music Corporation
Defendant: Henry L Guerra Family Trust, HGJB Enterprises LLC, JEB Trust, Jason E Bowen and Henry Lee Guerra
Case Number: 2:2019cv02473
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Stipulation and extending the deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint to July 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/9/2019. (TCA)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' ANSWER DEADLINE by Jason E Bowen, Henry Lee Guerra, HGJB Enterprises LLC, Henry L Guerra Family Trust, JEB Trust. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mixon, Nelson)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Defendants may have until June 28, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/21/2019. (TCA)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' ANSWER DEADLINE by Jason E Bowen, Henry Lee Guerra, HGJB Enterprises LLC, Henry L Guerra Family Trust, JEB Trust. (Mixon, Nelson)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Defendants may have until June 7, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 5/13/2019. (TCA)
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Jason E Bowen, Henry Lee Guerra, HGJB Enterprises LLC, Henry L Guerra Family Trust, JEB Trust. (Mixon, Nelson)
April 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by AF Circle C Fund LLC, Broadcast Music Incorporated, Broken Arrow Music Corporation, Coral Reefer Music, Cotillion Music Incorporated, Division of Praxis International Communications Incorporated, Eleksylum Music Incorporated, Fourteenth Hour Music Incorporated, No Surrender Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation, Welsh Witch Music. (Deatherage, Mark)
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by AF Circle C Fund LLC, Broadcast Music Incorporated, Broken Arrow Music Corporation, Coral Reefer Music, Cotillion Music Incorporated, Division of Praxis International Communications Incorporated, Eleksylum Music Incorporated, Fourteenth Hour Music Incorporated, No Surrender Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation, Welsh Witch Music: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice to Parties-Mandatory Discovery, General Order 17-08, Corporate Disclosure Statement upon HGJB Enterprises on 04/22/2019. (Deatherage, Mark)
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to HGJB Enterprises LLC. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on July 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 4/18/2019. (TCA)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 4/18/2019. (TCA)
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by AF Circle C Fund LLC, Broadcast Music Incorporated, Broken Arrow Music Corporation, Coral Reefer Music, Cotillion Music Incorporated, Division of Praxis International Communications Incorporated, Eleksylum Music Incorporated, Fourteenth Hour Music Incorporated, No Surrender Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation, Welsh Witch Music. (Deatherage, Mark)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (KEP)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16800534. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M. Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2473-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music Incorporated. (Deatherage, Mark) (KEP)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16800534 filed by AF Circle C Fund LLC, Eleksylum Music Incorporated, Fourteenth Hour Music Incorporated, Broadcast Music Incorporated, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation, Cotillion Music Incorporated, Division of Praxis International Communications Incorporated, No Surrender Music, Broken Arrow Music Corporation, Coral Reefer Music, Welsh Witch Music. (Deatherage, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music Incorporated et al v. HGJB Enterprises LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AF Circle C Fund LLC
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleksylum Music Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Division of Praxis International Communications Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coral Reefer Music
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welsh Witch Music
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fourteenth Hour Music Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cotillion Music Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: No Surrender Music
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broken Arrow Music Corporation
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry L Guerra Family Trust
Represented By: Nelson Alexander Floyd Mixon
Represented By: Barry Willits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HGJB Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Nelson Alexander Floyd Mixon
Represented By: Barry Willits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEB Trust
Represented By: Nelson Alexander Floyd Mixon
Represented By: Barry Willits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason E Bowen
Represented By: Nelson Alexander Floyd Mixon
Represented By: Barry Willits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Lee Guerra
Represented By: Nelson Alexander Floyd Mixon
Represented By: Barry Willits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?