Decor Team LLC et al v. McAleenan et al

Plaintiff: Liat Avisiria, Shai Avisira and Decor Team LLC
Defendant: L Francis Cissna, Kevin K McAleenan, Kathy Baran and Donald Neufeld
Case Number: 2:2019cv02567
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Case Voluntarily by Shai Avisira, Liat Avisiria, Decor Team LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Approval Notice for I-129 L-1A Status for Decor Team and Shai Avisira, #2 Exhibit Approval Notice of I-539 L2 Status for Dependents)(Joseph, Jeffrey)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Case Management Conference is set for August 12, 2019, at 10:30 a.m., in Courtroom 601, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 6/26/19. (MAW)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 *ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Kathy Baran, L Francis Cissna, Kevin K McAleenan, Donald Neufeld.(Girdharry, Glenn) *Modified to correct text on 6/26/2019 (REK).
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Matthew Girdharry on behalf of Kathy Baran, L Francis Cissna, Kevin K McAleenan, Donald Neufeld. (Girdharry, Glenn)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shai Avisira, Liat Avisiria, Decor Team LLC: Proof of Service re: Federal Express Signature Proof of Service upon Kevin McAleenan, Acting Secretary DHS on 5/2/19. (Joseph, Jeffrey)
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shai Avisira, Liat Avisiria, Decor Team LLC: Proof of Service re: Federal Express Signature Proof of Service upon Diana Varelna, US Attorney, William Barr, Attorney General and named parties on 4/24/19. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed Summons, #2 Summons Executed Summons, #3 Summons Executed Summons, #4 Summons Executed Summons, #5 Summons Executed Summons, #6 Summons Executed Summons, #7 Summons Executed Summons, #8 Summons Executed Summons)(Joseph, Jeffrey)
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT redacting names of minor children against All Plaintiffs filed by Decor Team LLC, Shai Avisira, Liat Avisiria. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Joseph, Jeffrey)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED sealing the Complaint (Doc. #1 ) and the Civil Cover Sheet (Doc. #1 -1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs must file redacted versions of the Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet no later than April 30, 2019. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/23/19. (SLQ)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on July 23, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; 3. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall file with the Clerk of Court a notice of service of MIDP Responses, supplemental MIDP Responses, and production of ESI, rather than copies of the actual disclosures [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/22/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice - MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW)
April 22, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Jeffrey Dean Joseph on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kathy Baran, L Francis Cissna, Kevin K McAleenan, Donald Neufeld, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(DLC)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16813019. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2567-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Shai Avisira, Liat Avisiria, Decor Team LLC. (Joseph, Jeffrey) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(DLC)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Decor Team LLC. (Joseph, Jeffrey) (DLC)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 *SEALED COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16813019 filed by Decor Team LLC, Shai Avisira, Liat Avisiria. (Joseph, Jeffrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19)(DLC) *Modified to seal pursuant to order #8 on 4/24/2019 (SLQ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Decor Team LLC et al v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liat Avisiria
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shai Avisira
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Decor Team LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Francis Cissna
Represented By: Glenn Matthew Girdharry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K McAleenan
Represented By: Glenn Matthew Girdharry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Baran
Represented By: Glenn Matthew Girdharry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Neufeld
Represented By: Glenn Matthew Girdharry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?