Gomez v. Sun Life Family Health Center Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Alice Gomez
Defendant: Unknown Parties, Robert Lundell, Unknown Lundell, United States of America and Sun Life Family Health Center Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv02665
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that counsel for the Plaintiff file a status report within 7 days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the matter will be dismissed without further notice 7 days from the date of this Order if counsel fails to file a status report [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/2/19. (MAW)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Alice Gomez: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project and Notice, Consent, Order of Reference-Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge upon Sunlife Family Health Center, Inc. on May 13, 2019. (Boatman, Robert)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Alice Gomez: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project and Notice, Consent, Order of Reference-Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge upon United States of America, by U.S. Attorney's Office on May 7, 2019. (Boatman, Robert)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Alice Gomez: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project and Notice, Consent, Order of Reference-Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge upon Robert Lundell, D.O. and Jane Doe (Alecia) Lundell on May 6, 2019. (Boatman, Robert)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED pursuant to Rule 4(m), Fed. R. Civ. P., that this action shall be dismissed without further notice after July 25, 2019, unless before then Plaintiff has served Defendants with the summons and complaint and has filed with the Clerk of the Court proof thereof pursuant to Rule 4(l) or has shown good cause for the failure to timely serve. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/1/19. (MAW)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Robert Lundell, Unknown Lundell, Sun Life Family Health Center Incorporated, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16834031. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Senior Judge Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-02665-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Alice Gomez. (Boatman, Robert) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(BAC)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alice Gomez. (BAC)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-16834031 filed by Alice Gomez. (Boatman, Robert) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Sun Life Family Health Center Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Gomez
Represented By: Daniel Gerard Harrington
Represented By: Matthew Robert Boatman
Represented By: Robert W Boatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lundell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lundell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life Family Health Center Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?