Young v. CVS Health Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Heather Young
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation, Unknown Nguyen and Hanh Nguyen
Case Number: 2:2019cv02709
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Amy Marie Wilkins. (Wilkins, Amy)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Marie Wilkins on behalf of Heather Young. (Wilkins, Amy)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CVS Health Corporation.(Haeffele, Andrew)
May 23, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Andrew Keith Haeffele on behalf of CVS Health Corporation. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. Plaintiff(s) must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than July 29, 2019. Plaintiffs must serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on July 29, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(LMR)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CVS Health Corporation, Hanh Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16844088. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P. Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2709-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Heather Young. (Wilkins, Amy) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(KEP)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16844088 filed by Heather Young. (Wilkins, Amy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. CVS Health Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Keith Haeffele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanh Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Young
Represented By: Amy Marie Wilkins
Represented By: James Edward Doman, Jr.
Represented By: Elliot Spencer Isaac
Represented By: Adam Patterson Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?