Bergeron v. Anytime Fitness AZ Development Group LLC et al

Plaintiff: Ramsey J Bergeron
Defendant: L13cky Health LLC and Anytime Fitness AZ Development Group LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02790
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles
Referring Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #12 , Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAMA)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ramsey J Bergeron. (Greenwald, Michael)
June 26, 2019 Remark: as to out of state attorney Edward H Maginnis - removed for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 5, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Scott C Harris on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED ORDER:Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the timerequired by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on August 2, 2019. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/17/2019. (TCA)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 **AMENDED BY DOC. 11* ORDER: Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the timerequired by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on September 4, 2019. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/17/2019. (TCA) Modified on 5/17/2019 (TCA).
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/17/2019. (TCA)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge John J. Tuchi. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-2790-PHX-JJT. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 3, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Michael L Greenwald on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Anytime Fitness AZ Development Group LLC, L13cky Health LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16862215. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2790-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Ramsey J Bergeron. (Greenwald, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MCO)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16862215 filed by Ramsey J Bergeron. (Greenwald, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bergeron v. Anytime Fitness AZ Development Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L13cky Health LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anytime Fitness AZ Development Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramsey J Bergeron
Represented By: Edward H Maginnis
Represented By: Michael L Greenwald
Represented By: Scott C Harris
Represented By: Scott Crissman Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?