O.P.E.N. America Incorporated v. JM & GW Enterprises LLC et al

Defendant: Jodie Leamer and JM & GW Enterprises LLC
Petitioner: O.P.E.N. America Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv02809
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 *ORDER granting a one-time extension of time of 30 days for defendants to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/20/2019. (MMO) *Modified to regenerate NEF on 6/21/2019 (SCH).
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by JM & GW Enterprises LLC, Jodie Leamer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dunn, Larry)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by O.P.E.N. America Incorporated: Proof of Service re: Petition to Compel Arbitration (Doc. 1); Notice, Consent and Order of Reference (Doc. 4); Leamer - Summons (Doc. 5); Notice to Parties re MIDP (Doc. 6); Order re Rule 12(b)(6) or 12(c) (Doc. 7) Proof of Service upon Jodie Leamer on 5/30/19. (Merrett, Andre)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by O.P.E.N. America Incorporated: Proof of Service re: Petition to Compel Arbitration (Doc. 1); Notice, Consent and Order of Reference (Doc. 4); Leamer - Summons (Doc. 5-1); Notice to Parties re MIDP (Doc. 6); Order re Rule 12(b)(6) or 12(c) (Doc. 7) Proof of Service upon JM & GW Enterprises, LLC on 5/30/2019. (Merrett, Andre)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/6/2019. (MMO)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to JM & GW Enterprises LLC, Jodie Leamer. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16864875. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-02809-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by O.P.E.N. America Incorporated. (Thorpe, William) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAC)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by O.P.E.N. America Incorporated. (BAC)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-16864875 filed by O.P.E.N. America Incorporated. (Thorpe, William) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit to Exh A (Decl) - part 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Exh A (Decl) - part 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibits 2-3 to Exh A (Decl), #6 Exhibit B-D)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O.P.E.N. America Incorporated v. JM & GW Enterprises LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodie Leamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JM & GW Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: O.P.E.N. America Incorporated
Represented By: Nicole Marie Stewart
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Represented By: Andre Harbon Merrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?