Parisienne v. Wave Enterprises LLC

Plaintiff: Theodore Parisienne
Defendant: Wave Enterprises LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02810
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns
Referring Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Wave Enterprises LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by attorney Heather Horrocks but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Nedda Gales. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMP)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 8/1/2019 for Defendant to respond to the complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/2/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wave Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gales, Nedda)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 8/26/2019 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order upon Defendant and file notice of service. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/18/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/17/2019. (LFIG)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibits, Due Diligence Affidavit upon Wave Enterprises, LLC on 6/10/2019. (SST)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Diane J Humetewa. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-2810-PHX-DJH. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for July 1, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order that Theodore Parisienne show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/1/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #5 Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Theodore Parisienne. The form is incomplete. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Wave Enterprises LLC. (ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Theodore Parisienne. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1) Title Page does not include filing attorney information in upper left corner. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Theodore Parisienne. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Theodore Parisienne. (Liebowitz, Richard) (ARC)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(ARC)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16865620. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2810-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. (ARC)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Theodore Parisienne. (Liebowitz, Richard) (ARC)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16865620 filed by Theodore Parisienne. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parisienne v. Wave Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Parisienne
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wave Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Todd Horrocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?