Burin v. NCC Business Services Incorporated

Plaintiff: Ana Marija Burin
Defendant: NCC Business Services Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv02837
Filed: May 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have a one-time extension to July 15, 2019 in which to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/25/2019. (REK)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint by NCC Business Services Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint)(Mullen, Jennifer)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - The Clerk shall terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 8/6/2019. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/6/19. (DXD)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to NCC Business Services Incorporated. (MFR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
May 4, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16871240. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-2837-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
May 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Ana Marija Burin. (Mazaheri, Bernard) (MFR)
May 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16871240 filed by Ana Marija Burin. (Mazaheri, Bernard) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burin v. NCC Business Services Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Marija Burin
Represented By: Bernard R Mazaheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCC Business Services Incorporated
Represented By: Jennifer Elaine Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?