Government Employees Insurance Company v. Beaver Coach Sales and Service of Oregon LLC et al
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Defendant: Unknown Parties, Norcold Incorporated and Beaver Coach Sales and Service of Oregon LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv03111
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #18 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery filed by Government Employees Insurance Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
June 18, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #17 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Government Employees Insurance Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
June 18, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Government Employees Insurance Company. (Patane, Angelo)
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Government Employees Insurance Company. (Patane, Angelo)
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Norcold Incorporated. (Lindsey, Barrett)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Defendant Government Employees Insurance Company show cause in writing on or before Wednesday, June 19, 2019, at 12:00 p.m. why the Court should not impose sanctions for failing to comply with the Court's prior notices. If Defendant files the required Corporate Disclosure Statement, the OSC shall automatically discharge and vacate. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/17/2019. (LFIG)
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Beaver Coach Sales and Service of Oregon LLC. (Lindvall, Alexander)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #12 Notice of Attorney Substitution (Within Firm Only) filed by Government Employees Insurance Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Angelo Joseph Patane. (Patane, Angelo)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 SECOND NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within seven (7) days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Government Employees Insurance Company. (LFIG)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beaver Coach Sales and Service of Oregon LLC. (Lindvall, Alexander)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Joseph Lindvall on behalf of Beaver Coach Sales and Service of Oregon LLC. (Lindvall, Alexander)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/17/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Norcold Incorporated.(Obert, Michael)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/16/19. (CLB)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Government Employees Insurance Company. (KAH)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KAH)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16909853. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-03111-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH)
May 15, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Affidavit of Service of Process re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Discovery Tier Level 2 upon Beaver Coach Sales and Service of Oregon LLC on 3/18/19 (Original filed in Yuma County Superior Court on 4/9/19.); Upon Norcold Inc. on 4/8/19 (Original filed in Yuma County Superior Court on 4/16/19.); Upon Norcold Inc. on 4/15/19 (Original filed in Yuma County Superior Court on 4/15/19.) (KAH) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norcold Incorporated. (Obert, Michael) (KAH)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Yuma County Superior Court, case number S1400CV201900144. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16909853 filed by Norcold Incorporated. (Obert, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-I, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental) (KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Company v. Beaver Coach Sales and Service of Oregon LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norcold Incorporated
Represented By: Barrett Neal Lindsey
Represented By: Michael Patrick Obert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beaver Coach Sales and Service of Oregon LLC
Represented By: Michael William Halvorson
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Lindvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Angelo Joseph Patane
Represented By: JoAnn Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?