Hanks v. Harper et al
Plaintiff: Bob L Hanks
Defendant: Christina Harper, Bank of America, US Bank Trust NA, Mortgage Law Firm, LSF9 Master Participation Trust, First American Title Insurance Company, Bank of America NA, Caliber Home Loans Incorporated, First American Financial Corporation, Unknown Parties and First American Financial Corporation doing business as First American Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv03174
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/7/2019 at 4:30 PM is RESET IN TIME ONLY. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference reset for 8/7/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
July 8, 2019 Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #45 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Response, Replies and Motions for Perpetrating a Hoax filed by Bob L Hanks. (DXD)
July 2, 2019 Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #45 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Response, Replies and Motions for Perpetrating a Hoax filed by Bob L Hanks. (SLQ) (8 pages).
July 1, 2019 Filing 56 APPLICATION and Affidavit of Default for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Bob L Hanks. (SST) (12 pages)
July 1, 2019 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #45 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Response, Replies and Motions for Perpetrating a Hoax filed by Bank of America NA. (Zimmerman, Joshua)
June 27, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #51 Response to Motion. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
June 27, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #50 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply In Suport Of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document entered in wrong case. As such, the incorrectly docketed motion has been terminated from this case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile document in correct case. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
June 26, 2019 Filing 54 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #45 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Response, Replies and Motions for Perpetrating a Hoax filed by Bob L Hanks. (DXD)
June 26, 2019 Filing 51 RESPONSE to Motion re: #45 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Response, Replies and Motions for Perpetrating a Hoax filed by Caliber Home Loans Incorporated, Christina Harper, LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (McDonald, Randal)
June 26, 2019 Filing 50 **WRONG CASE NUMBER** First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Caliber Home Loans Incorporated, Christina Harper, LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McDonald, Randal) *Attorney notified to docket in correct case at 52 NOD on 6/27/2019 (DXD).
June 24, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Bank of America NA. (Zimmerman, Joshua)
June 19, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #47 Response in Opposition to Motion. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
June 19, 2019 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #45 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Response, Replies and Motions for Perpetrating a Hoax filed by First American Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Glenn, Joseph)
June 17, 2019 Filing 46 RESPONSE to Motion re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bob L Hanks. (DXD)
June 17, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Response, Replies and Motions for Perpetrating a Hoax by Bob L Hanks. (DXD)
June 14, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #43 Reply to Response to Motion. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
June 14, 2019 Filing 43 *REPLY to Response to Motion re: #28 MOTION to Strike by Defendants Caliber Home Loans Incorporated, Christina Harper, LSF9 Master Participation Trust, US Bank Trust NA. (McDonald, Randal) *Modified to correct event/add filer on 6/17/2019 (DXD).
June 13, 2019 Filing 42 *REPLY to Response to Motion re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Caliber Home Loans Incorporated, Christina Harper, LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (McDonald, Randal) *Modified to correct event on 6/14/2019 (DXD).
June 13, 2019 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bank of America NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Zimmerman, Joshua)
June 12, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Bob L Hanks. (DXD)
June 11, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE re: Compliance and Clarification Notice by Bob L Hanks. (DXD)
June 11, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by First American Financial Corporation. (Glenn, Joseph) *Modified text on 6/12/2019 (DXD).
June 11, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Strike #19 Amended Complaint Or In The Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint With Prejudice by Bank of America NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zimmerman, Joshua)
June 10, 2019 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #9 MOTION for Findings of Fact, Conclusion of Law and Appropriate Judgment Pursuant to Rule 52(a) filed by Bob L Hanks. (DXD)
June 10, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE to Motion re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bob L Hanks. (DXD)
June 7, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE to Motion re: #28 MOTION to Strike filed by Bob L Hanks. (SST) (3 pages)
June 6, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bob L Hanks. (SST) (18 pages)
June 4, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Pending Motions by Bob L Hanks. (SST) (3 pages)
June 4, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Lodging Orders Pursuant to Rule 52(A) Finding of Facts, Conclusions of Law and Appropriate Judgment Thereon re: #9 MOTION by Bob L Hanks. (SST) (10 pages)
June 3, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion re: #9 MOTION for Findings of Fact, Conclusion of Law and Appropriate Judgment Pursuant to Rule 52(a) filed by Bank of America. (Zimmerman, Joshua)
May 31, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #28 MOTION to Strike filed by LSF9 Master Participation Trust, Caliber Home Loans Incorporated, Christina Harper. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
May 31, 2019 Filing 28 *MOTION to Strike by Caliber Home Loans Incorporated, Christina Harper, LSF9 Master Participation Trust, US Bank Trust NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McDonald, Randal) *Modified to add additional filer and to reflect Local Rule violation on 6/3/2019 (SST).
May 28, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #23 Additional Attachments to Main Document filed by First American Title Insurance Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
May 28, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #22 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by First American Title Insurance Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
May 28, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by First American Title Insurance Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
May 28, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #20 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel filed by First American Title Insurance Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. This notice also has the incorrect document title (it is not First American's Corporate Disclosure Statement). No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
May 28, 2019 Filing 23 *Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss Case All Claims Against First American, with prejudice by Defendant First American Financial Corporation. (Glenn, Joseph) *Modified to reflect correct filer; attorney noticed on 5/30/2019. Modified to reflect Local Rule violation (SST).
May 28, 2019 Filing 22 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by First American Financial Corporation. (Glenn, Joseph) *Modified to reflect correct filer; attorney noticed on 5/30/2019. Modified to reflect Local Rule violation (SST).
May 28, 2019 Filing 21 *MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by First American Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Glenn, Joseph) *Modified to reflect correct filer; attorney noticed on 5/30/2019. Modified to reflect Local Rule violation (SST). *Modified to correct event on 6/12/2019 (DXD).
May 28, 2019 Filing 20 *NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph James Glenn on behalf of First American Financial Corporation. (Glenn, Joseph) *Modified to reflect correct filer; attorney noticed on 5/30/2019. Modified to reflect Local Rule violation (SST).
May 28, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bank of America, Christina Harper, Mortgage Law Firm, US Bank Trust NA, LSF9 Master Participation Trust, Caliber Home Loans Incorporated, Bank of America NA, First American Financial Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company, Unknown Parties filed by Bob L Hanks. (SST) (32 pages)
May 23, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re: #17 MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default filed by Bob L Hanks. NOTE: Filed in State Court on 3/28/19 and docketed in District Court pursuant to #14 Notice. (DXD)
May 23, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default by Christina Harper. NOTE: Filed in State Court on 3/26/19 and docketed in District Court pursuant to #14 Notice. (DXD)
May 23, 2019 Filing 16 *MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Christina Harper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McDonald, Randal) *Modified to correct event/filer on 5/24/2019 (DXD).
May 23, 2019 Filing 15 *NOTICE re: Certificate of Conferral by Christina Harper. (McDonald, Randal) *Modified filer on 5/24/2019 (DXD).
May 23, 2019 Filing 14 *NOTICE re: Notice of Pending Motions by Christina Harper. (McDonald, Randal) *Modified filer on 5/24/2019 (DXD).
May 23, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Christina Harper identifying Corporate Parent US Bancorp and Caliber Home Loans Incorporated. (McDonald, Randal) *Modified filer/record on 5/24/2019 (DXD).
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 *NOTICE of Appearance by Randal Boyd McDonald, III on behalf of Christina Harper. (McDonald, Randal) *Modified to correct filer on 5/24/2019 (DXD).
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Bank of America.(Zimmerman, Joshua)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bank of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G, #2 Exhibit H-N)(Zimmerman, Joshua)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/7/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/17/2019. (MMO)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/17/2019. (MMO)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Findings of Fact, Conclusion of Law and Appropriate Judgment Pursuant to Rule 52(a) by Bob L Hanks. (DXD)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Bob L Hanks. (DXD)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTION/Response re: #1 Notice of Removal by Plaintiff Bob L Hanks. (DXD)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number CV2019-090789. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-03174-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America. (Zimmerman, Joshua) (BAC)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-090789. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-16920381 filed by Bank of America. (Zimmerman, Joshua) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(BAC)
May 16, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Lis Pendens, Plaintiff's Supplement to Complaint, Plaintiff's 2nd Supplement to Complaint, Plaintiff's 3rd Supplement to Complaint upon Christina Harper; Certificate of Service served to Christina Harper on 5/7/19(original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 3/8/19, and 5/8/19).(BAC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanks v. Harper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Harper
Represented By: Randal Boyd McDonald, III
Represented By: Brian Court Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Joshua Robert Zimmerman
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank Trust NA
Represented By: Randal Boyd McDonald, III
Represented By: Brian Court Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Randal Boyd McDonald, III
Represented By: Brian Court Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Joshua Robert Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans Incorporated
Represented By: Randal Boyd McDonald, III
Represented By: Brian Court Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Financial Corporation
Represented By: Richard L Cobb
Represented By: Joseph James Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Financial Corporation doing business as First American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L Cobb
Represented By: Joseph James Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob L Hanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?