Singh v. Singh et al

Appellee: Sawaranjit Singh, Eric M. Haley, Sarah Singh and Eric M Haley
Appellant: Ranjit Singh
Not Yet Classified: Super 8 Worldwide Incorporated, Extensia Financial and JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Trustee: United States Trustees Office
In Re: Regency Park Capital 2011 Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv03195
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Appellant must show cause in writing on or before July 29, 2019 why this action should not be terminated for failure to comply with the requirements stated in the Notice of Filing of Appeal and Notice of Referral of Appeal to the District Court #1 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate this action on July 30, 2019 without further notice if Appellant fails to comply. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/15/19. (CLB)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE from the Bankruptcy Court that the certificate that the Record on Appeal is complete cannot be filed for the reason(s) stated in the attached document. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Extensia Financial, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, Regency Park Capital 2011 Incorporated, Super 8 Worldwide Incorporated. (SLQ)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (SLQ)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Singh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sawaranjit Singh
Represented By: John T Gilbert
Represented By: Brian N Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Eric M. Haley
Represented By: Stuart B Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sarah Singh
Represented By: John T Gilbert
Represented By: Brian N Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Eric M Haley
Represented By: Stuart B Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ranjit Singh
Represented By: Keith M Knowlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Super 8 Worldwide Incorporated
Represented By: David Catuogno
Represented By: Daniel M Eliades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Extensia Financial
Represented By: Bernard D Bollinger, Jr.
Represented By: Steven Ronald Schneider
Represented By: William S Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Patricia Doyle-Kossick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: United States Trustees Office
Represented By: Christopher J Pattock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Regency Park Capital 2011 Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?