Qwest Corporation v. Andale Construction Incorporated

Plaintiff: Qwest Corporation
Defendant: Andale Construction Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv03361
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 8/28/2019 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/11/2019. (TCA)
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #13 Answer to Complaint filed by Andale Construction Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Andale Construction Incorporated.(Schneider, Jon)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER:Counsel for the Plaintiff shall file a status report or application for entry of default within 14 days of the date of this order concerning the statusof this case. Clerk of the Court to terminate this matter on July 22, 2019 without further order of this Court if plaintiff fails to file a statusreport or application for entry of default. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/8/2019. (TCA)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Qwest Corporation: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Order dated 5/29/19 (Doc. #9 ), Notice to Parties, General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist upon Mazin Sukkar, Vice-President of Andale Construction, Inc., authorized to receive and accept service of process on 6/18/19. (Vincent, Michael)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on August 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 5/29/2019. (TCA)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 5/29/2019. (TCA)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Qwest Corporation. (Vincent, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Qwest Corporation. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andale Construction Incorporated. (KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16941437. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M. Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-3361-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Qwest Corporation. (Vincent, Michael) (KEP)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Qwest Corporation. (Vincent, Michael) (KEP)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16941437 filed by Qwest Corporation. (Vincent, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Qwest Corporation v. Andale Construction Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andale Construction Incorporated
Represented By: Jon D Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qwest Corporation
Represented By: Michael Anthony Vincent
Represented By: Stefan Mark Palys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?