Gravestone Entertainment LLC v. Maxim Media Marketing Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Gravestone Entertainment LLC
Defendant: Darrin Ramage and Maxim Media Marketing Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv03385
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Maxim Media Marketing Incorporated, Darrin Ramage. (Ormond, Jill)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gravestone Entertainment LLC. (Lindstrom, Christopher)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Gravestone Entertainment LLC. (Lindstrom, Christopher)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maxim Media Marketing Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Maxim Media Marketing, Inc. for Maxim Media Marketing Incorporated. (Ormond, Jill)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Gravestone Entertainment LLC, Maxim Media Marketing Incorporated. (KFZ)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Maxim Media Marketing Incorporated, Darrin Ramage. (True, Nicole)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Gravestone Entertainment LLC. (Lindstrom, Christopher)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gravestone Entertainment LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Darrin Ramage & Maxim Media Marketing on 5/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed)(Lindstrom, Christopher)
May 23, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Christopher D Lindstrom on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED R.CIV.P. 4(M) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on August 21, 2019. (See document for complete details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/22/19. (SLQ)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Maxim Media Marketing Incorporated, Darrin Ramage. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (KEP)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16946613. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G. Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-3385-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Gravestone Entertainment LLC. (Lindstrom, Christopher) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(KEP)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16946613 filed by Gravestone Entertainment LLC. (Lindstrom, Christopher) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gravestone Entertainment LLC v. Maxim Media Marketing Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gravestone Entertainment LLC
Represented By: Christopher David Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrin Ramage
Represented By: Jill J Ormond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxim Media Marketing Incorporated
Represented By: Jill J Ormond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?