NT-MDT LLC et al v. Kozodaeva et al
Plaintiff: NT-MDT LLC and NT-MDT America Incorporated
Defendant: Irina Kozodaeva and Dimitry Kozodaeva
Case Number: 2:2019cv03691
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Michael Motolenich-Salas on behalf of Dimitry Kozodaeva, Irina Kozodaeva. (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth)
July 3, 2019 Filing 18 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by NT-MDT America Incorporated, NT-MDT LLC: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 6/13/2019 to Kozodaev, Dimitry . (Venable, Lance)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by NT-MDT America Incorporated, NT-MDT LLC: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 6/13/2019 to Kozodaeva, Irina . (Venable, Lance)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED vacating the Court's May 30, 2019 Order (Doc. #10 ). (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/19/19. (JAMA)
June 13, 2019 Filing 15 Remark: Pursuant to the request of Lance C. Venable, Law Office of Lance C. Venable, PPLC, a complaint, civil cover sheet, summons, corporate disclosure statement, and Notice Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot were mailed via registered mail number: RB336431385US to Dimitry Kozodaeva on 06/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Letter of Receipt of Service Fee and Receipt)(HLA) Modified on 6/24/2019 (HLA).
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 Remark: Pursuant to the request of Lance C. Venable, Law Office of Lance C. Venable, PPLC, a complaint, civil cover sheet, summons, corporate disclosure statement, and Notice Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot were mailed via registered mail number: RB3336431399US to Irina Kozodaeva on 06/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Letter of Receipt of Service Fee and Receipt)(HLA) Modified on 6/24/2019 (HLA).
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued in person at Customer Service Intake Counter as to Dimitry Kozodaeva, Irina Kozodaeva on 06/13/2019. (HLA)
June 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by NT-MDT America Incorporated, NT-MDT LLC. (Venable, Lance)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NT-MDT America Incorporated, NT-MDT LLC. (Venable, Lance)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 **VACATED by #16 **ORDER: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action shall be dismissed without further notice after August 27, 2019, unless before then Plaintiff has properly served Defendant with the Summons and Complaint and has filed with the Clerk of the Court proof thereof pursuant to Rule 4(l) or has shown good cause for the failure to timely serve. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/30/19. (JAMA) Modified on 6/20/2019 (REK).
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/30/19. (JAMA)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiffs NT-MDT America Incorporated, NT-MDT LLC. (Venable, Lance)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by NT-MDT America Incorporated, NT-MDT LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by NT-MDT America Incorporated, NT-MDT LLC. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to NT-MDT America Incorporated, NT-MDT LLC. (ARC)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(ARC)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16967192. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-3691-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16967192 filed by NT-MDT LLC, NT-MDT America Incorporated. (Venable, Lance) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NT-MDT LLC et al v. Kozodaeva et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NT-MDT LLC
Represented By: Lance Christopher Venable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NT-MDT America Incorporated
Represented By: Lance Christopher Venable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irina Kozodaeva
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Motolenich-Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimitry Kozodaeva
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Motolenich-Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?