Serfas Incorporated et al v. JKL Innovation Incorporated
Plaintiff: Moon Sport Limited and Serfas Incorporated
Defendant: JKL Innovation Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv03745
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Serfas Incorporated: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Ted Luymes, Esq. for JKL Innovation, Inc. on July 8, 2019. (Shindler, Buzzi)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting the Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint (Doc. #12 ) and extending Defendant's time to file an answer in response to the Complaint (Doc. #1 ) to August 23, 2019. No further extensions will be granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is to file proof of service of the Complaint and Summons within seven days of the date of this Order. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/19/19. (LAD)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Moon Sport Limited, Serfas Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shindler, Buzzi)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Serfas Incorporated. (Shindler, Buzzi)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action shall be dismissed without further notice after August 28, 2019, unless before then Plaintiff has properly served Defendant with the Summons and Complaint and has filed with the Clerk of the Court proof thereof pursuant to Rule 4(l) or has shown good cause for the failure to timely serve. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/31/19. (JAMA)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/31/19. (JAMA)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to JKL Innovation Incorporated. (DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to JKL Innovation Incorporated. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(DLC)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16972109. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-3745-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Serfas Incorporated and Moon Sport Limited. (Shindler, Buzzi) (DLC)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Serfas Incorporated and Moon Sport Limited. (Shindler, Buzzi) (DLC)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16972109 filed by Serfas Incorporated and Moon Sport Limited. (Shindler, Buzzi) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serfas Incorporated et al v. JKL Innovation Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moon Sport Limited
Represented By: Buzzi Louis Shindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serfas Incorporated
Represented By: Buzzi Louis Shindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JKL Innovation Incorporated
Represented By: Ted H Luymes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?