Asarco LLC v. United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC et al

Plaintiff: ASARCO LLC
Defendant: Local 2181 International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC, Local Union No. 741 United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Trade, Locals 518, 570 and 602 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Brenda Frazier, Local 104 International Brotherhood of Teamsters Chauffeurs Warehousemen & Helpers, Millwrights Local 1914, Local 428 International Union of Operating Engineers and Local 627 International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Shipbuilders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers
Case Number: 2:2019cv04393
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1002
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 57 Letter Re Transfer of 3:18-cv-2813-N from the Northern District of Texas to the District of Arizona. New Case Number: CV-19-4393-PHX-SRB. (MAP)
June 6, 2019 Filing 56 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-02813 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
May 21, 2019 Interdistrict Transfer to District of Arizona; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER (record does not contain restricted documents). Counsel advised to file future documents in District of Arizona. (rekc) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Transfer Case out of District. The Court orders that this case be transferred to the District of Arizona. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/21/2019) (rekc) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 54 REPLY filed by Asarco LLC re: #46 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (Lubben, David) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 53 Appendix in Support filed by Asarco LLC re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Lubben, David) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 52 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Asarco LLC re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Lubben, David) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Asarco LLC (Lubben, David) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 50 RESPONSE filed by Brenda Frazier, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Local 2181, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Shipbuilders, Blacksmith, Forgers and Helpers Local 627, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Locals 518, 570 and 602, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers of America, Local 104, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 428, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada Local 741, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC re: #46 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Appendix ISO Ds' Response to ASARCO Motion to Amend, #2 Declaration(s) of Joel Hurt ISO Ds' Response to ASARCO Motion to Amend, #3 Exhibit(s) 1 - ASARCO Updated Class List dated March 29, 2019, #4 Exhibit(s) 2 - ASARCO's Resp to Request for Marked Changes) (Ewing, Pamina) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE of Conference re #46 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Notice of Correction of Certificate of Conference by David Lubben on behalf of Asarco LLC (Lubben, David) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 48 STATUS REPORT filed by Asarco LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Order from D. Az. denying motion to set Rule 16 scheduling conference) (Lubben, David) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 47 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Asarco LLC re #46 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (Lubben, David) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Asarco LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit G to Proposed First Amended Complaint) (Lubben, David)[Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF ORDER ENTERED IN RELATED CASE BY THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF ARIZONA filed by Brenda Frazier, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Local 2181, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Shipbuilders, Blacksmith, Forgers and Helpers Local 627, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Locals 518, 570 and 602, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers of America, Local 104, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 428, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada Local 741, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A - Order Denying Mtn to Dismiss and Mtn for Judgment) (Ewing, Pamina) Modified text on 4/3/2019 (ykp). [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26 Mandatory Disclosures filed by Asarco LLC (Lubben, David) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 43 REPLY filed by Brenda Frazier, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Local 2181, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Shipbuilders, Blacksmith, Forgers and Helpers Local 627, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Locals 518, 570 and 602, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers of America, Local 104, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 428, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada Local 741, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC re: #41 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of The Moving Defendants Motion to Dismiss or Transfer (Ewing, Pamina) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 42 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Asarco LLC re: #41 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of The Moving Defendants Motion to Dismiss or Transfer (Lubben, David) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of The Moving Defendants Motion to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Brenda Frazier, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Local 2181, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Shipbuilders, Blacksmith, Forgers and Helpers Local 627, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Locals 518, 570 and 602, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers of America, Local 104, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 428, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada Local 741, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC (Attachments: #1 The Moving Defendants Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss or Transfer) (Ewing, Pamina)[Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 40 STATUS REPORT Rule 26(f) Report filed by Asarco LLC. (Russo, Richard) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Asarco LLC re: #37 MOTION to Stay re #36 Status Report Order, Moving Defendants Motion to Stay Rule 26(f) and Rule 16 Proceedings in Light of Their Motion to Dismiss in Favor of Arizona Case (Lubben, David) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 38 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Brenda Frazier, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Local 2181, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Shipbuilders, Blacksmith, Forgers and Helpers Local 627, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Locals 518, 570 and 602, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers of America, Local 104, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 428, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada Local 741, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC re #37 MOTION to Stay re #36 Status Report Order, Moving Defendants Motion to Stay Rule 26(f) and Rule 16 Proceedings in Light of Their Motion to Dismiss in Favor of Arizona Case (Ewing, Pamina) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Stay re #36 Status Report Order, Moving Defendants Motion to Stay Rule 26(f) and Rule 16 Proceedings in Light of Their Motion to Dismiss in Favor of Arizona Case filed by Brenda Frazier, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Local 2181, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Shipbuilders, Blacksmith, Forgers and Helpers Local 627, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Locals 518, 570 and 602, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers of America, Local 104, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 428, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada Local 741, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Pamina Ewing added to party International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Local 2181(pty:dft), Attorney Pamina Ewing added to party International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Shipbuilders, Blacksmith, Forgers and Helpers Local 627(pty:dft), Attorney Pamina Ewing added to party International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Locals 518, 570 and 602(pty:dft), Attorney Pamina Ewing added to party International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers of America, Local 104(pty:dft), Attorney Pamina Ewing added to party International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 428(pty:dft), Attorney Pamina Ewing added to party United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada Local 741(pty:dft) (Ewing, Pamina) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/22/2019) (axm) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 35 Appendix in Support Volume Two filed by Brenda Frazier, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Local 2181, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Shipbuilders, Blacksmith, Forgers and Helpers Local 627, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Locals 518, 570 and 602, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers of America, Local 104, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 428, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada Local 741, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC re #16 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) of Pamina Ewing in Further Support of the Moving Defendants' Mtn to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit(s) M - Order Granting Mtn to Transfer Related Cases Dated Dec. 20, 2018, #3 Exhibit(s) N - Amended Class Action Complaint filed Nov. 16, 2018, #4 Exhibit(s) O - ASARCO Answer to Amended Complaint filed Dec. 3, 2018, #5 Exhibit(s) P - 2002 SPD - Ray dated Jul. 1, 2002, #6 Exhibit(s) Q - 2007 Basic Labor Agreement dated Jan. 1, 2007, #7 Exhibit(s) R - 2013 Extension Agreement dated Jun 28, 2013, #8 Exhibit(s) S - 2015 Notice of Termination dated Jun. 5, 2015, #9 Exhibit(s) T - 2019 ASARCO Medicare Eligible Retiree Medical Plan Effective May 1, 2019, #10 Exhibit(s) U - Mtn for Order Approving New CBA with Union filed Feb. 27, 2007, #11 Exhibit(s) V - Parties Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement) (Ewing, Pamina) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 34 REPLY filed by Brenda Frazier, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Local 2181, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Shipbuilders, Blacksmith, Forgers and Helpers Local 627, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Locals 518, 570 and 602, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers of America, Local 104, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 428, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada Local 741, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Ewing, Pamina) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 33 Appendix in Support filed by Asarco LLC re #32 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Lubben, David) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 32 RESPONSE filed by Asarco LLC re: #25 MOTION to JoinMoving Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss (Lubben, David) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 31 RESPONSE filed by Asarco LLC re: #24 MOTION to Join Defendants United Steelworkers and IBEW Local 570s Motion to Dismiss (Lubben, David) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 30 Appendix in Support filed by Asarco LLC re #29 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits to Appendix) (Lubben, David) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 29 RESPONSE filed by Asarco LLC re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Lubben, David) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #27 Motion to Extend Time to File Response. ASARCO's response to the motion to dismiss or transfer is due December 14, 2018 (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/6/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #16 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by Asarco LLC (Lubben, David) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #23 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Desmond C. Lee. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/3/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 25 Joinder to #16 Motion to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Brenda Frazier with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) Declaration of Defendant Brenda Frazier)Attorney Joseph H Gillespie added to party Brenda Frazier(pty:dft) (Gillespie, Joseph) Modified text on 11/29/2018 (rekc). [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to JoinDefendants United Steelworkers and IBEW Local 570s Motion to Dismiss filed by Millwrights Local 1914 (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) of Harry Beggs) (Lee, Desmond) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 23 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9600211) filed by Millwrights Local 1914 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Desmond Chaehun Lee added to party Millwrights Local 1914(pty:dft) (Lee, Desmond) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William T. Payne. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/19/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ruairi McDonnell. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/19/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joel R. Hurt. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/19/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Pamina Ewing. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/19/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 18 Appendix in Support filed by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Local 2181, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Shipbuilders, Blacksmith, Forgers and Helpers Local 627, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Locals 518, 570 and 602, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers of America, Local 104, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 428, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada Local 741, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC re #17 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Declaration(s), #11 Declaration(s), #12 Declaration(s), #13 Declaration(s), #14 Declaration(s), #15 Declaration(s), #16 Declaration(s), #17 Declaration(s), #18 Declaration(s), #19 Declaration(s), #20 Declaration(s)) (Gillespie, Joseph) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 17 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Local 2181, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Shipbuilders, Blacksmith, Forgers and Helpers Local 627, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Locals 518, 570 and 602, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers of America, Local 104, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 428, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada Local 741, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC re #16 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Gillespie, Joseph) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division () filed by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Local 2181, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Shipbuilders, Blacksmith, Forgers and Helpers Local 627, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Locals 518, 570 and 602, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers of America, Local 104, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 428, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada Local 741, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC Attorney Joseph H Gillespie added to party International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Local 2181(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph H Gillespie added to party International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Shipbuilders, Blacksmith, Forgers and Helpers Local 627(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph H Gillespie added to party International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Locals 518, 570 and 602(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph H Gillespie added to party International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers of America, Local 104(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph H Gillespie added to party International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 428(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph H Gillespie added to party United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada Local 741(pty:dft) (Gillespie, Joseph) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9582816) filed by Brenda Frazier, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Local 2181, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Shipbuilders, Blacksmith, Forgers and Helpers Local 627, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Locals 518, 570 and 602, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers of America, Local 104, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 428, Millwrights Local 1914, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada Local 741, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney William T Payne added to party United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC(pty:dft) (Payne, William) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9582794) filed by Brenda Frazier, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Local 2181, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Shipbuilders, Blacksmith, Forgers and Helpers Local 627, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Locals 518, 570 and 602, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers of America, Local 104, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 428, Millwrights Local 1914, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada Local 741, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Ruairi McDonnell added to party United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC(pty:dft) (McDonnell, Ruairi) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9582751) filed by Brenda Frazier, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Local 2181, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Shipbuilders, Blacksmith, Forgers and Helpers Local 627, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Locals 518, 570 and 602, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers of America, Local 104, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 428, Millwrights Local 1914, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada Local 741, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Joel Hurt added to party United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC(pty:dft) (Hurt, Joel) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9582685) filed by Brenda Frazier, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Local 2181, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Shipbuilders, Blacksmith, Forgers and Helpers Local 627, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Locals 518, 570 and 602, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers of America, Local 104, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 428, Millwrights Local 1914, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada Local 741, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Pamina Ewing added to party United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC(pty:dft) (Ewing, Pamina) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph H Gillespie on behalf of United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Gillespie, Joseph) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted as to United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada Local 741. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s)) (Lubben, David) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Brenda Frazier ; served on 10/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s)) (Lubben, David) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Local 2181 ; served on 10/29/2018; International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Shipbuilders, Blacksmith, Forgers and Helpers Local 627 ; served on 10/29/2018; International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Locals 518, 570 and 602 ; served on 10/29/2018; International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers of America, Local 104 ; served on 10/29/2018; International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 428 ; served on 10/29/2018; United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC ; served on 10/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s) Affidavits of service for all of these defendants) (Lubben, David) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Millwrights Local 1914; served on 11/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s)) (Lubben, David) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service of Process on Defendants filed by Asarco LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Lubben, David) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas J Enoch on behalf of International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Locals 518, 570 and 602. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Enoch, Nicholas) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Brenda Frazier, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers Local 2181, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Shipbuilders, Blacksmith, Forgers and Helpers Local 627, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Locals 518, 570 and 602, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, and Helpers of America, Local 104, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 428, Millwrights Local 1914, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada Local 741, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC. (rekc) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Asarco LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Grupo Mexico SAB de CV, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Asarco USA, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Americas Mining Corp., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Asarco Inc for Asarco LLC. (Lubben, David) [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Asarco LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9534538) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 2007 BLA, #2 Exhibit(s) 2010 MOA, #3 Exhibit(s) 2011 MOA, #4 Exhibit(s) 2013 Extension Agreement, #5 Exhibit(s) BLA Termination Notices, #6 Exhibit(s) 2002 Ray SPD, #7 Exhibit(s) Asarco Medicare Eligible Retiree Medical Plan SPD, #8 Cover Sheet) (Lubben, David) (Attachment 8 replaced with flattened image on 10/23/2018) (rekc). [Transferred from txnd on 6/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asarco LLC v. United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 2181 International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers
Represented By: Joseph H Gillespie
Represented By: Pamina G Ewing
Represented By: William T Payne
Represented By: Ruairi McDonnell
Represented By: Joel R Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC
Represented By: Joseph H Gillespie
Represented By: Pamina G Ewing
Represented By: William T Payne
Represented By: Ruairi McDonnell
Represented By: Joel R Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local Union No. 741 United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Trade
Represented By: Joseph H Gillespie
Represented By: Pamina G Ewing
Represented By: William T Payne
Represented By: Ruairi McDonnell
Represented By: Joel R Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Locals 518, 570 and 602 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers
Represented By: Nicholas Jason Enoch
Represented By: Joseph H Gillespie
Represented By: Pamina G Ewing
Represented By: Stanley Lubin
Represented By: William T Payne
Represented By: Ruairi McDonnell
Represented By: Joel R Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Frazier
Represented By: Joseph H Gillespie
Represented By: Pamina G Ewing
Represented By: William T Payne
Represented By: Ruairi McDonnell
Represented By: Joel R Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 104 International Brotherhood of Teamsters Chauffeurs Warehousemen & Helpers
Represented By: Joseph H Gillespie
Represented By: Pamina G Ewing
Represented By: William T Payne
Represented By: Ruairi McDonnell
Represented By: Joel R Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millwrights Local 1914
Represented By: Desmond C Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 428 International Union of Operating Engineers
Represented By: Joseph H Gillespie
Represented By: Pamina G Ewing
Represented By: William T Payne
Represented By: Ruairi McDonnell
Represented By: Joel R Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 627 International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Shipbuilders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers
Represented By: Joseph H Gillespie
Represented By: Pamina G Ewing
Represented By: William T Payne
Represented By: Ruairi McDonnell
Represented By: Joel R Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASARCO LLC
Represented By: David George Lubben
Represented By: Jennette E DePonte
Represented By: Richard A Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?