Adriana's Insurance Services Incorporated v. adrianas.com et al
Plaintiff: Adriana's Insurance Services Incorporated
Defendant: Unknown Parties and adrianas.com
Case Number: 2:2019cv04433
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Remark: as to out of state attorney Jeremy D Richardson - removed for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 27 *Notice of Change of Address(Attorney) by Adriana's Insurance Services Incorporated . (Strong, Timothy) *Modified on 7/5/2019 to correct event type (MSA).
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: This Preliminary Injunction shall become effective upon the posting of a bond in the amount of One-Thousand Dollars ($1,000)pursuant to Rule 65, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. [See attached order for additional information.] Signed by Senior Judge Neil V. Wake on 7/1/2019. (RMW)
July 1, 2019 Filing 25 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW Signed by Senior Judge Neil V. Wake on 7/1/2019. (RMW)
June 28, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE re: [Proposed] Preliminary Injunction Order by Adriana's Insurance Services Incorporated re: 22 Motion Hearing, Common Prompts (Text Only) . (Foss, Taylor)
June 28, 2019 Filing 23 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Plaintiff Adriana's Insurance Services Incorporated. (Foss, Taylor)
June 28, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Neil V. Wake: Motion Hearing re: Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #2 ) held on 6/28/2019. Defendants do not appear. Discussion held. The Court is inclined to grant Plaintiff's motion. Plaintiff is directed to submit proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and form of order for the Court's approval by close of business this date. APPEARANCES: Taylor Foss and Amy Levine for Plaintiff with Client Representative Priscilla Abundis-Guillen. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams) Hearing held 1:39 PM to 1:51 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
June 21, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Priscilla Abundis-Guillen re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Adriana's Insurance Services Incorporated. (Levine, Amy)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: This Order shall continue until after conclusion of the preliminary injunction hearing on 6/28/2019, the date of any extension of the expiration date granted by the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of Adriana's Insurance for a preliminary injunction shall be heard on 6/28/2019, in Courtroom 401 of the United States Courthouse, Phoenix, Arizona, at 1:30 PM. [See attached order for additional information.] Signed by Senior Judge Neil V. Wake on 6/21/2019. (RMW)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re: #18 Scheduling Conference: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted leave to serve subpoenas upon Domains By Proxy, LLC, Wild West Domains, LLC, GoDaddy.com, LLC and/or GoDaddy Operating Company, LLC to obtain documents, communications, and other information pertaining to the identity of the owner of the adrianas.com domain name, as well as any documents, communications, and other information regarding the creation, operation, and termination of the www.adrianas.com website. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that upon identification of the owner and amendment of the Complaint to name the owner of the adrianas.com domain name as a defendant, the parties will meet and confer to create a Discovery Plan and submit it to the Court within 45 days after the Complaint has been amended to add the new defendant(s). Signed by Senior Judge Neil V. Wake on 6/20/2019. (RMW)
June 20, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Neil V. Wake: Scheduling Conference held on 6/20/2019. IT IS ORDERED granting the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, (Doc. #2 ), and issuing a temporary restraining order for up to fourteen (14) days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting a hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Doc. #2 ), for Friday, 6/28/2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 401. Plaintiff shall appear in person at the motion hearing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery, (Doc. #16 ). Separate order to follow. [See attached pdf for complete details.] (Court Reporter Laurie Adams) Hearing held 1:41 PM to 1:55 PM.(RMW)
June 20, 2019 Filing 17 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Adriana's Insurance Services Incorporated. (Levine, Amy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Adriana's Insurance Services Incorporated. (Levine, Amy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENT Supplemental Briefing in Support of Plaintiff's Mtion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Adriana's Insurance Services Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Levine, Amy)
June 18, 2019 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Adriana's Insurance Services Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Notice to Parties-MIDP; Order 17-08; MIDP Checklist; Notice to Parties; Minute Entry upon adrianas.com on 06/12/2019. (Levine, Amy)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Adriana's Insurance Services Incorporated. (Strong, Timothy)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Adriana's Insurance Services Incorporated: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Motion for TRO and Preliminary Inuunction, Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Civil Coverseet, Corporate Disclosure Statement upon adrianas.com on 6/11/2019. (Strong, Timothy)
June 13, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Taylor Foss on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held on 6/11/2019 before Senior Judge Neil V Wake: This is the time set for Scheduling Conference concerning the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, (Doc. #2 ). Defendants do not appear. Plaintiff advises the Court as to efforts to serve Defendants notice of this hearing. Discussion held. Scheduling Conference continued to 6/20/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 401, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Neil V. Wake. Plaintiff is directed to give notice of the continued hearing to Defendants. APPEARANCES: Amy Levine for Plaintiff Adrianan's Insurance Services. Defendants not present. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams) Hearing held 3:33 PM to 4:02 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference concerning the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, (Doc. #2 ) for 6/11/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 401, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003. Plaintiff shall give actual notice of this hearing to Defendant promptly. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V. Wake on 6/11/2019. (RMW)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to adrianas.com. (KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (KEP)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17018761. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Neil V. Wake. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4433-PHX-NVW. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Adriana's Insurance Services Incorporated. (Strong, Timothy)(KEP)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Adriana's Insurance Services Incorporated. (Strong, Timothy) (KEP)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Adriana's Insurance Services Incorporated. (Strong, Timothy) (KEP)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17018761 filed by Adriana's Insurance Services Incorporated. (Strong, Timothy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adriana's Insurance Services Incorporated v. adrianas.com et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adrianas.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriana's Insurance Services Incorporated
Represented By: Timothy Mark Strong
Represented By: Amy Robyn Levine
Represented By: Taylor C Foss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?