Williams v. AZ Fry Guy LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ebony Williams
Defendant: Raisins K Mitchell, Unknown Mitchell, Unknown Hall, A Taste of Soul LLC, Gregory P Hall and AZ Fry Guy LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04441
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles
Referring Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to A Taste of Soul LLC, AZ Fry Guy LLC, Gregory P Hall, Unknown Hall, Raisins K Mitchell, Unknown Mitchell - Pursuant to Rule 55 (a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and upon application by the plaintiff, default is hereby entered against Defendants AZ Fry Guy LLC, A Taste of Soul LLC, Gregory P Hall, Unknown Hall, Raisins K Mitchell and Unknown Hall. (EJA)
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Ebony Williams against The AZ Fry Guy, LLC; A Taste of Soul, LLC; Gregory P. Hall and Jane Doe Hall; and Raisins K. Mitchell and John Doe Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Clifford P. Bendau, II)(Bendau, Clifford)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan R Bolton. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-4441-PHX-SRB. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for July 30, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ebony Williams: Declaration of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon John Doe Mitchell on 6/20/2019. (Bendau, Clifford)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ebony Williams: Declaration of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Raisins K. Mitchell on 6/20/2019. (Bendau, Clifford)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ebony Williams: Declaration of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Jane Doe Hall on 6/20/2019. (Bendau, Clifford)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ebony Williams: Declaration of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Gregory P. Hall on 6/20/2019. (Bendau, Clifford)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ebony Williams: Declaration of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon A Taste of Soul LLC on 6/20/2019. (Bendau, Clifford)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ebony Williams: Declaration of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon The AZ Fry Guy LLC on 6/26/2019. (Bendau, Clifford)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order that Ebony Williams show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/30/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (KAH). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KAH)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17028013. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04441-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (KAH)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Ebony Williams. (Bendau, Clifford) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (KAH)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17028013 filed by Ebony Williams. (Bendau, Clifford) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. AZ Fry Guy LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raisins K Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Taste of Soul LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory P Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AZ Fry Guy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebony Williams
Represented By: Christopher Jacob Bendau
Represented By: Clifford Phillip Bendau, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?