Prater et al v. AP Acquisitions LLC et al
Plaintiff: Melanie Prater and Cory Wietelman
Defendant: AP Acquisitions LLC, Manisha Patel Dhanani and Niraj Dhanani
Case Number: 2:2019cv04455
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. The parties shall submit their joint proposed case management plan not less than seven (7) days before the Scheduling Conference. (See attached Order for additional details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/9/19. (JAMA)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting Defendants until August 5, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. #1 ). (See attached Order for complete details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/8/19. (JAMA)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT by Melanie Prater, Cory Wietelman. (Hill, Nathaniel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AP Acquisitions LLC, Manisha Patel Dhanani, Niraj Dhanani. (Leavitt, Lindsay)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AP Acquisitions LLC, Manisha Patel Dhanani, Niraj Dhanani.(Leavitt, Lindsay)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that counsel for the Plaintiffs apply for entry of default or file a status report within seven days of the date of this Order concerning the status of this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the matter will be dismissed without further notice if counsel fails to apply for entry of default or file a status report within seven days of the date of this Order. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/31/19. (JAMA)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Melanie Prater, Cory Wietelman: Return of Service re: Complaint upon Niraj Dhanani on July 2, 2019. (Hill, Nathaniel)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Melanie Prater, Cory Wietelman: Return of Service re: Complaint upon Manisha Patel Dhanani on July 2, 2019. (Hill, Nathaniel)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Melanie Prater, Cory Wietelman: Return of Service re: Complaint upon AP Acquisitions, LLC on July 2, 2019. (Hill, Nathaniel)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on September 12, 2019. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/14/19. (JAMA)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/14/19. (JAMA)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to AP Acquisitions LLC, Niraj Dhanani and Manisha Patel Dhanani. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17041409. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4455-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Melanie Prater and Cory Wietelman. (Hill, Nathaniel) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DLC)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Melanie Prater and Cory Wietelman. (Hill, Nathaniel) (DLC)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17041409 filed by Melanie Prater and Cory Wietelman. (Hill, Nathaniel) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prater et al v. AP Acquisitions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AP Acquisitions LLC
Represented By: Jordan Thomas Leavitt
Represented By: Lindsay G Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manisha Patel Dhanani
Represented By: Jordan Thomas Leavitt
Represented By: Lindsay G Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niraj Dhanani
Represented By: Jordan Thomas Leavitt
Represented By: Lindsay G Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Prater
Represented By: Nathaniel James Hill
Represented By: Michael Rhodes Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Wietelman
Represented By: Nathaniel James Hill
Represented By: Michael Rhodes Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?