Edmiston v. Point Wireless Brokers LLC
Plaintiff: Samantha Edmiston
Defendant: Point Wireless Brokers LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04458
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Referring Judge: Deborah M Fine
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Scheduling Conference is re-set from 8/12/2019 to 8/20/2019 at 01:15 PM in Courtroom 502, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Susan R Bolton. Ordered by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/17/19. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Point Wireless Brokers LLC. (Anderson, Nathan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan R Bolton. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-4458-PHX-SRB. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for July 30, 2019 is hereby VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for August 12, 2019 is affirmed unless reset by separate order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 *AMENDED By Doc. 16 *MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan R Bolton. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-4458-PHX-SRB. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for July 30, 2019 is hereby VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED The Settlement Conference date is affirmed unless reset by separate order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) *Modified on 7/12/2019 (MAP).
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order that Samantha Edmiston show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/30/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Defendant's #6 Motion to Change Filing Date on the Notice of Removal. The filing date on the Notice of Removal and related documents shall be June 13, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 7/1/19. (MSA)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 304, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 6/26/2019. (REK)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Point Wireless Brokers LLC.(Anderson, Nathan)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION Change of Filing Date re: #1 Notice of Removal by Point Wireless Brokers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Anderson, Nathan)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Point Wireless Brokers LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edmiston v. Point Wireless Brokers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Edmiston
Represented By: Stephanie Robyn Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Point Wireless Brokers LLC
Represented By: Bradley Steven Shelts
Represented By: Nathan Boyd Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?