Labine v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Thomas Richard Labine
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv04528
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle
Referring Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TRIAL. Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle added. Chief Judge G Murray Snow no longer assigned to case. All further pleadings shall list the following case number: CV-19-4528-PHX-JZB. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/7/19. (MAP)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Wyeth McAdam appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (McAdam, S)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Thomas Richard Labine: Notice of Service re: Summons upon William Barr, US Attorney General (07/05/19); Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (07/05/19); Elizabeth Strange, First Assistant US Attorney for the District of Arizona (07/09/19) on 07/05/19; 07/05/19; 07/09/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Domestic return receipts and certified mail receipts)(Caldwell, Mark)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER - Within sixty (60) days after the answer is filed, Plaintiff must file an opening brief addressing why the Commissioner's decision is not supported by substantial evidence or why the decision should otherwise be reversed or the case remanded. Defendant must file an answering brief within thirty (30) days after service of Plaintiff's opening brief. Plaintiff may file a reply brief within fifteen (15) days after service of Defendant's brief. (See document for complete details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/9/19. (SLQ)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P.4(m) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on September 20, 2019. (See document for complete details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/9/19. (SLQ)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS)
June 25, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Received: $ 400.00 receipt number 0970-17085153. (Caldwell, Mark)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee of $400.00 within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order or this matter may be terminated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate this action if Plaintiff fails to comply with the Court's Order within the time stated above and without further notice. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/24/19. (CLB)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04528-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Thomas Richard Labine. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (KAH)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Thomas Richard Labine. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KAH)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Thomas Richard Labine. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Labine v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Richard Labine
Represented By: Mark Ross Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: S Wyeth McAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?